Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-01269
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2022 12:27 AM MST
Defendant
Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez (1)
Represented By
Michael Richard Ziemba
Law Offices Of Michael Ziemba
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
LeighAnn Thomas
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/01/2022 1:11 AM MST
Sunday, August 28, 2022
Arrest of Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez on 8/28/2022. (KGM) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez. (KGM) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez held on 8/30/2022. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Defendant avows he does not have the financial means to afford an attorney. Appointing Michael Richard Ziemba for Defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Spanish Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Krissa Lanham on behalf of LeighAnn Thomas for the Government, CJA Attorney Michael Ziemba for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Susana Carman assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 3:12 PM to 3:16 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 8/31/2022.(KGM) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
6 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez.(Ziemba, Michael) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 9/1/22. (EC) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
8 8 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT PENDING as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez. Judge Bolton drawn. Waiver number WI 22-00685 PHX-SRB (DMF). (SLQ) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
9 9 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez. (SLQ) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
10 10 IT IS ORDERED setting a change of plea hearing (30 mins) as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez for 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine. (DMF/ah)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:22-mj-03269-MTM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
11 11 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez. (ESG)
Related: [-]
12 12 INFORMATION - Felony as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez (1) count(s) 1. (ESG)
Related: [-]
13 13 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ESG)
Related: [-]
14 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine: Change of Plea Hearing as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez held on 9/29/2022. Defendant waives a formal reading and enters a plea of guilty as to the Information. THE COURT ORDERS pending hearings VACATED. The Court directs the US Probation Office to prepare a Presentence Report. Appearances : AUSA Genevieve Ozark on behalf of AUSA LeighAnn Thomas for the Government, CJA Attorney Michael Ziemba for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Isabel Fierros assists defendant. Sentencing set for 12/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R. Bolton. Related [+] Hearing held 10:03 AM to 10:25 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
15 15 LODGED PLEA AGREEMENT as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez re: 14 Change of Plea Hearing. (ESG)
Related: [-]
17 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION UPON A PLEA OF GUILTY as to Cesar Xaciel Hernandez-Valdez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine on 9/29/2022.(ESG)
Related: [-]