Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-15389

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:22-ap-01320
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2022
Terminated:Oct 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
THEODORE FIORE, SR, Defendant
256 LAFAYETTE AVENUE
LYNDHURST, NJ 07071
Represented By
THEODORE FIORE, SR
contact info
Plaintiff
PMC, Inc., Plaintiff
12243 Branford St.
Sun Valley, CA 91352
Represented By
Douglas G. Leney
Archer & Greiner, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, October 21, 2022
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 10/21 4:15 PM
Adversary Case (2:22-ap-1320) Closed. (jf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/04 1:42 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01320 Complaint by PMC, Inc. against THEODORE FIORE SR. Fee Amount $ 350.. (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Lease # 2 Exhibit B: Sublease # 3 Exhibit C: 12/10/2021 Order # 4 Exhibit D: 7/8/2022 Order) filed by Plaintiff PMC, Inc.,2 Summons Issued to PMC, Inc. for Service on THEODORE FIORE, SR. Answer due on 11/2/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (sjp)
Monday, October 03, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 10/03 5:26 PM
Summons Issued to PMC, Inc. for Service on THEODORE FIORE, SR. Answer due on 11/2/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (sjp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/30 2:56 PM
Adversary case 22-01320 Complaint by PMC, Inc. against THEODORE FIORE SR. Fee Amount $ 350.. (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Lease
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Sublease
Att: 3 Exhibit C: 12/10/2021 Order
Att: 4 Exhibit D: 7/8/2022 Order