Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Ronnie L White
Case #: 4:22-cv-01054
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 5:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Boeing
Defendant
Boeing Defense Space and Security
Defendant
David Calhoun
Plaintiff
Ayman Amara
7605 S. Maplewood Ave.
Tulsa, OK 74136

GPO Nov 01 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) and his motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 3) are held in ABEYANCE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a written supplement to his application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by December 1, 2022. The supplement shall include (1) his wife's monthly or yearly income, and (2) the amount of money he and his wife have in cash, checking, and/or savings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply timely and fully with this Order will result in the denial of Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/1/2022.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/1/2022. (TMT)
GPO Nov 16 2022
r of Service of Summons)(TMT)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 3) is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff: (i) a file-stamped copy of the complaint; (ii) three (3) summons forms; (iii) a "Notice of Intent to Use Private Process Server" form; and (iv) three (3) "Waiver of Service" forms. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause service to be effected upon defendants no later than ninety (90) days from the date of this order. In the absence of good cause shown, failure to timely serve said defendants shall result in the dismissal of plaintiff's claims as to said defendants without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/16/2022. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment File-marked copy of Complaint, # (2) Attachment Summons 1, # (3) Attachment Summons 2, # (4) Attachment Summons 3, # (5) Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, # (6) Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons, # (7) Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons, # (8) Attachment Waive
GPO Apr 11 2024
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Right to Sue Boeing Due to Medical Conditions (ECF No. 16) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 11, 2024. (BRP)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Memorandum & Order Thu 04/11 1:10 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Right to Sue Boeing Due to Medical Conditions (ECF No.16 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 11, 2024. (BRP)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 04/11 1:10 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 17. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Thu Apr 11 13:10:31 CDT 2024 (Porter, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
16 16 motion Extension Tue 04/02 8:57 AM
MOTION TO EXTEND RIGHT TO SUE BOEING DUE TO MEDICAL CONDITIONS by Plaintiff Ayman Amara. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 05/03 3:04 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff Ayman Amara's failure to comply with the Court's Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/3/2023. (TMT)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/03 3:04 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15. Wed May 3 15:04:55 CDT 2023 (Tillman, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Mon 05/01 10:22 AM
Letter to Clerk of Court from Plaintiff, Ayman Amara re: Waiver of Service of Summons sent to defendant. (TMT)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 05/01 10:18 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re9 MOTION for Reconsideration re6 Memorandum & Order filed by Plaintiff Ayman Amara. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
12 12 misc Affidavit Mon 04/17 1:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiff Ayman Amara. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/17 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Receipt from USPS by Plaintiff Ayman Amara re8 MOTION to Amend/Correct,9 MOTION for Reconsideration re6 Memorandum & Order.(TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
10 10 misc Return Letter from Clerk Tue 04/11 2:51 PM
RETURN LETTER from clerk to Plaintiff, Ayman Amara re: Return of Document (TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Returned Document
Monday, April 10, 2023
9 9 motion Reconsideration Mon 04/10 12:35 PM
MOTION to Appeal Denial of Legal Counselor re6 Memorandum & Order by Plaintiff Ayman Amara.(TMT) (TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope 1
Att: 2 6 pgs (4/10/2023) Exhibit Supporting Documentation
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/10 12:14 PM
MOTION to Amend Name of Defendant by Plaintiff Ayman Amara.(TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope 1
Monday, March 20, 2023
7 7 misc Return Letter from Clerk Mon 03/20 10:33 AM
RETURN LETTER from clerk to Plaintiff, Ayman Amara re: Return of Documents (TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Returned Document,
Att: 2 Attachment Returned Document,
Att: 3 Envelope 1
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
6 6 4 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 11/16 3:30 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No.2 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No.3 ) is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff: (i) a file-stamped copy of the complaint; (ii) three (3) summons forms; (iii) a "Notice of Intent to Use Private Process Server" form; and (iv) three (3) "Waiver of Service" forms. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause service to be effected upon defendants no later than ninety (90) days from the date of this order. In the absence of good cause shown, failure to timely serve said defendants shall result in the dismissal of plaintiff's claims as to said defendants without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/16/2022.(TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment File-marked copy of Complaint,
Att: 2 Attachment Summons 1,
Att: 3 Attachment Summons 2,
Att: 4 Attachment Summons 3,
Att: 5 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server,
Att: 6 Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons,
Att: 7 Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons,
Att: 8 Attachment Waiver of Service of Summons
misc Order Receipt Wed 11/16 3:30 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Wed Nov 16 15:30:26 CST 2022 (Tillman, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
misc Receipt Wed 11/09 3:01 AM
Receipt 12928 in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of For Case Number DMOE422cv001 (CCAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
5 5 4 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 11/01 11:52 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No.2 ) and his motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No.3 ) are held in ABEYANCE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a written supplement to his application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by December 1, 2022. The supplement shall include (1) his wife's monthly or yearly income, and (2) the amount of money he and his wife have in cash, checking, and/or savings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply timely and fully with this Order will result in the denial of Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/1/2022.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/1/2022. (TMT)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 11/01 11:52 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Tue Nov 1 11:52:35 CDT 2022 (Tillman, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Tue 10/04 7:53 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Boeing, Boeing Defense Space and Security. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/14/2022.) (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 10/03 12:31 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ayman Amara. (JBH)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/03 12:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ayman Amara. (JBH)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/03 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Boeing, Boeing Defense Space and Security, David Calhoun Jury Demand,, filed by Ayman Amara.(JBH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter
misc Case Opening Notification Mon 10/03 12:42 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY) Mon 10/03 12:42 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JBH)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY) Mon 10/03 1:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Oct 3 13:01:20 CDT 2022 (admin,)
Related: [-]