Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-19349
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
PATRICK SOTOMAYOR
1105 55th Street South
GULFPORT, FL 33707
Represented By
GREGORY DONALD BROWN
Fleming Nolen & Jez Llp - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/15 9:36 AM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/15/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 06, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/06 1:10 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by PATRICK SOTOMAYOR. (BROWN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Mon 03/06 1:09 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by PATRICK SOTOMAYOR. (BROWN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 03/06 3:39 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:2 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend1 Complaint,3 Amended Complaint. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/03 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7484856.), filed by PATRICK SOTOMAYOR. (BROWN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET