Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-19353
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
COREY ROBERT CLOWERS
Represented By
JOHN P CANNON
Cannon & Associates - Edmond Ok
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 10/04 8:11 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer. Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet, which can be obtained from the forms and publication at www.flnd.uscourts.gov (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17), using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." Re1 Complaint filed by COREY ROBERT CLOWERS (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
4 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - All 3M Cases should be opened in the Pensacola Division. At case opening please choose Origin Code 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File (not 1 Original Proceeding). Also be advised that all party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation unless it's part of the party name. Clerk will correct origin code and party name. (djb)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 10/03/2022. Case Number 1:22-cv-245. (djb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order Mon 10/03 3:12 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/03 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7483579.), filed by Corey Robert Clowers. (CANNON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 10/03 3:18 PM
Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 10/03/2022. Case Number 1:22-cv-245. (djb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/03 3:23 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - All 3M Cases should be opened in the Pensacola Division. At case opening please choose Origin Code 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File (not 1 Original Proceeding). Also be advised that all party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation unless it's part of the party name. Clerk will correct origin code and party name. (djb)
Related: [-]