New York Western District Court
Judge:Geoffrey Crawford
Case #: 1:22-cv-00749
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 6:57 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Sujin Elizabeth Lee
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Schulman
Pillinger Miller Tarallo, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Rist Transport, Ltd.
Represented By
Sarah P. Rera
Gross Shuman P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Howard Washington
Represented By
Sarah P. Rera
Gross Shuman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Rist Transport, Ltd.
369 Bostwick Road
Phelps, NY 14532
Represented By
Sarah P. Rera
Gross Shuman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Howard Washington
345 Shirley Avenue
Buffalo, NY 14215
Represented By
Sarah P. Rera
Gross Shuman P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Chang Lee
Represented By
William P. Kelly
Mccarthy & Kelly LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mi Lee
Represented By
William P. Kelly
Mccarthy & Kelly LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yong Lee
Represented By
William P. Kelly
Mccarthy & Kelly LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Katlyn Vancamp
1422 33rd Ave NE
Olympia, WA 98506
Represented By
William P. Kelly
Mccarthy & Kelly LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Sujin Elizabeth Lee
1616 Judd Street SE
Lacey, WA 98503
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Schulman
Pillinger Miller Tarallo, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Rist Transport, Ltd.
Represented By
Sarah P. Rera
Gross Shuman P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Howard Washington
Represented By
Sarah P. Rera
Gross Shuman P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation Tue 05/14 11:37 AM
STIPULATION Stipulation of Discontinuance by Rist Transport, Ltd., Howard Washington. Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
Friday, April 12, 2024
23 23 adr Mediation Certification Fri 04/12 2:59 PM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. The case has settled. (Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
22 22 adr Mediation Certification Tue 04/09 1:36 PM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. The case has not settled mediation will continue on 3/28/2024.(Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr Mediation Certification Tue 04/09 1:29 PM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. The case has not settled mediation will continue on 2/12/2024.(Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
20 20 adr Mediation Certification Wed 12/06 8:54 AM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. The case has not settled mediation will continue on 1/9/2024.(Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/09 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Krajewski on behalf of Sujin Elizabeth Lee (Krajewski, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
18 18 adr Mediation Certification Wed 11/08 2:09 PM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. Mediation session has been adjourned to 12/4/2023.(Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
17 17 adr Mediation Certification Wed 09/13 1:10 PM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. The case has not settled mediation will continue on 11/8/2023.(Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
16 16 adr Mediation Certification Wed 05/24 1:01 PM
Mediation Certification by Michael F Perley. The case has not settled mediation will continue on 9/13/2023.(Perley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
15 15 adr Stipulation-Selection of Mediator Tue 04/11 10:59 AM
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Rist Transport, Ltd., Howard Washingto Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
Monday, March 20, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 03/20 1:53 PM
ANSWER to12 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Rist Transport, Ltd., Howard Washington Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 discov Rule 26 Disclosure Thu 03/16 2:13 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE by Sujin Elizabeth Lee.(Schulman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Set of Interrogatories
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
adr ADR Plan Wed 03/08 9:04 AM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] . (JLV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Tue 03/07 4:04 PM
ANSWER to9 Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Sujin Elizabeth Lee.(Schulman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Mon 02/13 12:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Third Party Complaint served on Sujin Elizabeth Lee on 02/06/2023, filed by Rist Transport, Ltd., Howard Washington. Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
Thursday, December 08, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 12/08 10:07 AM
Third Party Summons Issued as to Sujin Elizabeth Lee. (JLV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
9 9 cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 12/07 2:25 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sujin Elizabeth Lee, filed by Howard Washington, Rist Transport, Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
Att: 1 Summons
adr ADR Plan Wed 12/07 10:08 AM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] . (JLV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/06 2:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rist Transport, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Wadhams Enterprises, Inc. for Rist Transport, Ltd... Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/06 2:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Rist Transport, Ltd., Howard Washington Related [+]
Related: [-] ra, Sarah
Monday, December 05, 2022
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/05 12:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Howard Washington on 10/12/2022, filed by Chang Lee, Mi Lee, Yong Lee, Katlyn Vancamp. (Kelly, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/17 4:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on defendant RIST Transport Ltd through Office of the Secretary of State on 10/11/2022, filed by Chang Lee, Mi Lee, Yong Lee, Katlyn Vancamp. (Kelly, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/05 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Rist Transport, Ltd., Howard Washington. (JLV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
3 3 service Original Summons Filed Tue 10/04 11:56 AM
Original Summons Filed. (Kelly, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Original Summons Filed Tue 10/04 11:56 AM
Original Summons Filed. (Kelly, William)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/04 11:17 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 10/04 11:18 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 10/04 11:19 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 10/04 11:20 AM
Original Summons Not Submitted. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/03 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4689546, filed by Katlyn Vancamp, Yong Kil Lee, Chang Eun Lee, Mi Sook Lee.(Kelly, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet