Kansas District Court
Judge:Toby Crouse
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:22-cv-02397
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Terminated:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Chicken Mary's Restaurant, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Whitney Vinzant
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Taco Vida, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Taco Republic Corinth, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Louie's Wine Dive, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Louie's Wine Dive of Overland Park, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Louie's Wine Dive St. Louis, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Latin King Restaurant, The, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gram & Dun KC, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fresko, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brewtops South KC, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brewtops North KC, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brewtop Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
BRGR PV, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
BRGR KCMO, LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Viva Italia! LLC
Represented By
Lydia M. Middleton
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Samantha Jane Monsees
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maura Healy
Represented By
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Michael A. Hodgson
The Hodgson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Coen
Represented By
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Michael A. Hodgson
The Hodgson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordyn Crawford
Represented By
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Michael A. Hodgson
The Hodgson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Bonfanti
Represented By
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Michael A. Hodgson
The Hodgson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Riggs
Represented By
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Michael A. Hodgson
The Hodgson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
John Luongo
Represented By
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Michael A. Hodgson
The Hodgson Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Monday, February 12, 2024
126 126 order Dismissing Case Mon 02/12 8:30 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 2/9/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
125 125 order Order Fri 02/09 4:11 PM
ORDER re124 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiffs filed a stipulation of dismissal without prejudice that has not been signed or approved by any of the defendants. Doc. 124. Parties may dismiss their case by stipulation without court approval in certain circumstances. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). But where, as here, there are defendants who have appeared and filed answers or other pending motions before their stipulation, the stipulation must be signed by all parties who have so appeared. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) (describing the process for dismissal by court order). Because Plaintiffs' stipulation is not signed by each party who appeared, it is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 2/9/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ta)
Related: [-]
124 124 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/09 2:48 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Rebecca Arafa, Lisa Battani, Michelle Berry, Margaret Bonfanti, Elizabeth Brewer, Payton Clark, Jessica Coen, Jordyn Crawford, Jeremy DeWeese, Stephanie DeWeese, Gary Durham, Kathleen Ebert, Angie Groves, Maura Healy, Roman Higgins, Tiara Jacobs-Veltri, John Luongo, Kastriot Maloku, Talonn E. Medley, Scott Riggs, Ella Smith, Joshua Whitman, Austin James Wilson. (Ziegelmeyer, John)
Related: [-]