Colorado District Court
Judge:N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:22-cv-02588
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Case in other court:Boulder County District Court, 2022CV30597
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 4:52 AM MDT
Defendant
AmTrust Insurance Company
Represented By
Hayleigh P. Lidbury
Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP
contact info
Kyle Brandon Joyce
Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasyah Amina Astudillo
Represented By
Ryan Thomas Earl
Earl & Earl PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, October 26, 2023
41 41 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Thu 10/26 8:52 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to40 STIPULATION of Dismissal 10/26/2023. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Wed 10/25 5:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Jasyah Amina Astudillo. (Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 09/14 4:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/14/2023. In light of the Notice of Settlement (Dkt. #[38[), it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #25 ) is DENIED as moot. Dismissal papers are due on or before October 27, 2023 . PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER (norlin, )
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 09/14 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Jasyah Amina Astudillo (Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
37 37 order Minute Order Fri 08/04 8:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on August 4, 2023. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
36 36 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 08/04 8:41 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2023. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #25 ) is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court will issue a written order in due course. All discovery in this matter is STAYED pending a determination on the motion for summary judgment. If the motion for summary judgment is denied, within 5 days of that decision, the parties shall contact Chambers to set a follow-up scheduling conference. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Exhibits Thu 08/03 1:38 PM
Exhibits in Support For August 3rd, 2023 Hearing by Plaintiff Jasyah Amina Astudillo.(Earl, Collin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 07/26 7:06 PM
REPLY to Response to25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company.(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
33 33 respm Response to Motion Wed 07/12 8:31 PM
RESPONSE to25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Jasyah Amina Astudillo.(Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Progress Notes,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Affidavit of Adrien Gomez,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Marcelino Martinez,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Declaration of Joe Soto, Jr.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- Declaration of Maximo Martinez,
Att: 7 Exhibit Privilege Log for Plaintiff's Response
Monday, June 26, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 06/26 10:03 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 26 June 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Vacate Trial and Amend Scheduling Order (Dkt. #30 ) is GRANTED as follows. The trial set to commence December 12, 2023 and the remaining deadlines for expert disclosures, 702 motions, the discovery cut off, and dispositive motions are VACATED. The parties shall be prepared to discuss resetting these deadlines at the motion hearing set on August 3,2023. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to FileLevel 1 Restricted Access to Exhibits C, D, H, I, J, K, L, M, N, and O in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #26 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain Dkt. ##27-1 through 27-10 under Level 1 restriction.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/23 11:05 AM
NOTICE re30 Joint MOTION to Vacate Trial and Amend Scheduling Order in Compliance with Local Rule 6.1(c) by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company (Joyce, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
30 30 motion Vacate Thu 06/22 10:46 AM
Joint MOTION to Vacate Trial and Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company.(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/22 10:29 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 June 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #28 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before July 12, 2023. It is further ORDERED that a telephonic Motion Hearing is SET on August 3, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. The parties shall be prepared to argue their respective positions concerning Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390#. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 06/21 6:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Jasyah Amina Astudillo.(Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan T. Earl in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
27 27 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Wed 06/07 5:22 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company..(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C to MSJ,
Att: 2 Exhibit D to MSJ,
Att: 3 Exhibit H to MSJ,
Att: 4 Exhibit I to MSJ,
Att: 5 Exhibit J to MSJ,
Att: 6 Exhibit K to MSJ,
Att: 7 Exhibit L to MSJ,
Att: 8 Exhibit M to MSJ,
Att: 9 Exhibit N to MSJ,
Att: 10 Exhibit O to MSJ
26 26 motion Leave to Restrict Wed 06/07 5:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company. (Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Wed 06/07 4:21 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to MSJ (Complaint),
Att: 2 Exhibit B to MSJ (Policy),
Att: 3 Exhibit C to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 4 Exhibit D to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document,
Att: 5 Exhibit E to MSJ (Transcript),
Att: 6 Exhibit F to MSJ (License),
Att: 7 Exhibit G to MSJ (TAR),
Att: 8 Exhibit H to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 9 Exhibit I to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 10 Exhibit J to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 11 Exhibit K to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 12 Exhibit L to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 13 Exhibit M to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 14 Exhibit N to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 15 Exhibit O to MSJ (placeholder for restricted document),
Att: 16 Exhibit P to MSJ (Affidavit),
Att: 17 Exhibit Q to MSJ (CCES screenshot),
Att: 18 Exhibit R to MSJ (Weld Cty Rpt),
Att: 19 Exhibit S to MSJ (Plf Demand Ltr))(Lidbury, Hayleigh
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
24 24 minutes Status Conference Tue 05/30 1:15 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/30/2023. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
23 23 order Protective Order Wed 05/17 9:15 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 May 2023. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 05/17 9:14 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 May 2023. Finding good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. #21 ) is GRANTED. The proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. #21-2) and its Exhibit A (Dkt. #21-1) are APPROVED with the changes at page 4 and made an Order of Court. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Protective Order Tue 05/16 12:33 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company.(Joyce, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 05/03 9:12 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3 May 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Dkt. #19 ) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is AMENDED to reflect the following deadlines: Discovery due by 9/8/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. A telephonic Status Conference Remains set on May 30, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (888)398-2342, Access Code 5755390# to participate. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
19 19 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Thu 04/27 4:53 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company. (Joyce, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/13 9:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on January 12, 2023. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/13 9:58 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2023. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# to participate. Discovery due by 8/11/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2023. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. A five-day Jury Trial is set to begin December 11, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter in Courtroom C203, Second floor, Bryon G. Rogers Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
16 16 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 01/05 12:29 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jasyah Amina Astudillo. (Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 12/30 11:42 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/30/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 12/29 2:22 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 10/21 3:58 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint and jury demand by AmTrust Insurance Company.(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/14 2:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Westco Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services Inc. for AmTrust Insurance Company. (Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/07 5:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc., filed by Jasyah Amina Astudillo.(Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/05 10:29 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5 October 2022. Consent Form due by 12/29/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/5/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2023 11:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 10/04 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Earl on behalf of Jasyah Amina AstudilloAttorney Ryan Thomas Earl added to party Jasyah Amina Astudillo(pty:pla) (Earl, Ryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 10/04 12:25 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Tue 10/04 12:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, Summons, Exhibit 1, Exhibit 2, District Court Civil Cover Sheet upon Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. on 9/1/2022 (norlin, )
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Tue 10/04 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc., filed by Jasyah Amina Astudillo.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Tue 10/04 12:19 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
Related: [-]
misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 10/04 12:24 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 10/03 8:13 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on behalf of defendant by Hayleigh P. Lidbury on behalf of AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.Attorney Hayleigh P. Lidbury added to party AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lidbury, Hayleigh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/03 8:08 PM
NOTICE of filing state court docket sheet by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.(Joyce, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Ntc File State Court Docket - State Court Docket
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/03 8:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2022CV30597. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8693930), filed by AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc..(Joyce, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A to Ntc Removal - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Ntc Removal - Birth Certificate,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Ntc Removal - Greeley School Enrollment Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Ntc Removal - Astudillo People Map,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Ntc Removal - Delaware Secretary of State Document,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Ntc Removal - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Ntc Removal - Return of Service,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Ntc Removal - Documents Filed in State Court,
Att: 9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet USDC Supplemental Cover Sheet