California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 2:22-cv-07154
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2022
Last checked: Friday Mar 31, 2023 2:31 AM PDT
Defendant
DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron H Cole
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Omar Mohammed Aniff
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Catherine Brackett
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron H Cole
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Omar Mohammed Aniff
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Catherine Brackett
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Twinkle Tuttle
Represented By
Michael Elkin
Elkin Gamboa LLP
contact info
Alfredo Nava
Kyle Todd PC
contact info
Kyle Todd
Kyle Todd, P.C.
contact info
Jessica Renee Gamboa
Elkin Gamboa And Ashkinadze LLP
contact info
Benjamin Alan McLain
Elkin Gamboa LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Fri 09/13 3:59 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/31/2025. (mga)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 09/13 3:58 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2024. Discovery cut-off 3/3/2025. Motions cut-off 5/19/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/31/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/09 7:29 PM
The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2023. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
17 17 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 01/30 6:14 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial fourteen (14) to twenty-one (21) days, filed by Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc... (Aniff, Omar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
16 16 notice Related Case(s) Thu 12/01 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.. Related Case(s): 1) Superior Court of the State of California, Riverside County Case No. CVRI2103134; 2) USDC Case No. 5:22-cv-00950-JGB-SP; 3) USDC Case No. 5:22-cv-01816-JGB-SP; 4) Superior Court of California County of Riverside Case No. CVRI2204527 (Cole, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 11/17 4:44 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 11/07 4:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc..(Aniff, Omar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 11/03 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Omar Mohammed Aniff counsel for Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.. Adding Omar M. Aniff as counsel of record for DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc. and DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants DVA RENAL HEALTHCARE, INC. and DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc.. (Attorney Omar Mohammed Aniff added to party DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Omar Mohammed Aniff added to party Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.(pty:dft))(Aniff, Omar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 10/26 2:10 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 10/25 4:38 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc. answer now due 11/7/2022; DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc. answer now due 11/7/2022, filed by Defendants Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.; DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc..(Cole, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
10 10 order Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34) Wed 10/19 4:25 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:22-cv-00950 JGB(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-07154 JGB(SPx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 10/13 5:20 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 10/03 9:57 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 10/03 9:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 10/03 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Mon 10/03 9:51 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John E. McDermott. New Case Number 2:22-cv-07154 MEMF (JEMx). (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
4 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.. (Brackett, Catherine)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.. Related Case(s): CVRI2103134; and CVRI2203627; (Brackett, Catherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc., (Brackett, Catherine)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, case number 22STCV25918 Receipt No: ACACDC-34081872 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc., DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc.. (Attorney Catherine Brackett added to party DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Catherine Brackett added to party Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brackett, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott Herod in Support of Removal of Civil Action to USDC,
Att: 2 Declaration of Carol Strong in Support of Removal of Civil Action to USDC
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 10/03 10:02 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DVA Renal Healthcare, Inc., Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Twinkle Tuttle. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/10/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]