Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-19497
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Apr 06, 2023 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
BROOKS TAYLOR
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 06, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/06 9:53 AM
ORDER - Plaintiffs 4 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss their claims without prejudice is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, February 23, 2023
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 02/23 2:52 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION to Dismiss (no response) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
4 4 motion Dismiss Wed 02/08 6:46 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by BROOKS TAYLOR. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/22/2023) . (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/04 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Kentucky Western by BROOKS TAYLOR (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/04 11:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/04 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7487506.), filed by BROOKS TAYLOR. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]