Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephanie M Rose
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:22-cv-00338
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2022
Terminated:Dec 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 02, 2023 4:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited
Represented By
Kevin J. Driscoll
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
GuideOne Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael W. Thrall
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Matthew A. McGuire
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Patrick Kennedy
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
David Attisani
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/28 1:22 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (btg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
18 18 misc Stipulation Tue 12/27 4:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by GuideOne Insurance Company. (Thrall, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
order Order Fri 12/16 9:50 AM
TEXT ORDER granting16 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Answer or File Responsive Pleading. Defendant has until January 17, 2023 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/16/2022. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 12/14 10:32 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extension of Deadline to File Answer or File Responsive Pleading by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
15 15 misc Withdrawal of Document Tue 12/13 9:47 AM
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Withdrawal of Document Tue 12/13 9:46 AM
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Withdrawal of Document Tue 12/13 9:45 AM
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Thu 12/01 11:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4993343 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Thu 12/01 11:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4993337 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Thu 12/01 11:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4993334 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Thu 12/01 11:35 AM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited. (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/01 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Driscoll on behalf of Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited (Driscoll, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/13 4:30 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David A. Attisani; granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Patrick Kennedy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/13/2022. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
5 5 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF Tue 10/11 10:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by GuideOne Insurance Company. (Thrall, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Tue 10/11 10:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4949366 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GuideOne Insurance Company. (Thrall, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/11 4:54 PM
TEXT ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Patrick Kennedy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/11/2022. (btg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Thu 10/06 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4947500 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GuideOne Insurance Company. (Thrall, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
2 2 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Wed 10/05 11:28 AM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (btg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7.1 packet
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/04 12:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Howden Reinsurance Brokers Limited Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number CIASDC-4944637., filed by GuideOne Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/2/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/2/2023.(Thrall, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet