Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:22-cv-61848
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023
Case in other court:17th Judicial Circuit Court, CACE-22-013415
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY
200 S Biscayne Blvd., Ste. 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC
200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Ste 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC
200 S Biscayne Blvd., Ste 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC
200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Ste. 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Noizz Florida Mall, LLC
200 S Biscayne Blvd., Ste 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Mania Topanga Mall, LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC
200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Ste 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Ste. 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Mania Florida Mall, LLC
200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Ste 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC
200 S Biscayne Blvd., Ste. 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
ELIOR PEREZ
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon San Juan LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Retail USA, LLC
200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Jean Company LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon International Plaza LLC
200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Houston Galleria LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Florida Mall LLC
200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Coastland Center LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC
200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alec Robert Shelowitz
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski, P.A.
contact info
Rasheem Johnson
Kl Gates
contact info
Jason Monroe Murray
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Mallory Meagan Cooney
Kandl Gates
contact info
Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
OR Mania USA, Inc.
9100 S. Dadeland Blvd., Ste 1800
Miami, FL 33156
Represented By
Michael F Suarez
Kubicki Draper, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
29 29 misc Transmittal Letter Sent to State Court - FORM Wed 09/27 2:51 PM
Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of remand to: 17th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: CACE-22-013415 (nwn)
Related: [-]
28 28 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 09/27 2:48 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in and for Broward County, Florida. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/17 11:27 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to18 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. (Einhorn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Fri 01/13 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Alec Robert Shelowitz (Shelowitz, Alec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 01/12 11:15 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to18 Response in Opposition to Motion, by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC.(Einhorn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreed Order on Defendants' Second Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 01/12 4:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Reply due on or before January 17, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/12/2023. (agy)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/13 8:50 AM
Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) . Replies due by 1/17/2023. PER DE#24 (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/11 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alec Robert Shelowitz on behalf of CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Coastland Center LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Florida Mall LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Houston Galleria LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon International Plaza LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Jean Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon Retail USA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Carbon San Juan LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party ELIOR PEREZ(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Mania Florida Mall, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Mania Topanga Mall, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Noizz Florida Mall, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alec Robert Shelowitz added to party Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC(pty:dft). (Shelowitz, Alec)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
21 21 notice Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel - aty Fri 01/06 5:39 PM
NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Robert Mitchell Einhorn on behalf of CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC instead of prior counsel of record Jason Murray, Mallory Cooney, and Rasheem Johnson. . Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Coastland Center LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Florida Mall LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Houston Galleria LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon International Plaza LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Jean Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon Retail USA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Carbon San Juan LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party ELIOR PEREZ(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Mania Florida Mall, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Mania Topanga Mall, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Noizz Florida Mall, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC(pty:dft). (Einhorn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 01/03 10:51 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Response due on or before January 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/3/2023. (agy)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/03 11:42 AM
Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) . Responses due by 1/12/2023. PER DE#20 (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 12/27 2:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. (Murray, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/21 6:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by OR Mania USA, Inc.. Replies due by 12/28/2022. (Suarez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/23 8:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Response due on or before December 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/23/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Wed 11/23 1:09 PM
Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) . Responses due by 12/21/2022 per d.e. 17 Order. (mee)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/21 11:32 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) by OR Mania USA, Inc.. (Suarez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/14 5:44 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DE 6-3 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Murray, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/07 10:16 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,, by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. (Murray, Jason)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/07 10:39 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/7/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/07 10:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER entered3 Motion. This action has been transferred to Judge Rodney Smith by Order of the Court [DE 7]. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/7/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/07 10:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. All Defendants: response due on or before November 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/7/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/07 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion. See Transfer Order [DE 7]. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/7/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Mon 11/07 10:46 AM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Coastland Center LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Florida Mall LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Houston Galleria LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon International Plaza LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Jean Company LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon Retail USA, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Carbon San Juan LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; ELIOR PEREZ response/answer due 11/14/2022; MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Mania Florida Mall, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Mania Topanga Mall, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Noizz Florida Mall, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022; Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC response/answer due 11/14/2022. PER DE# 13 (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/04 3:53 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by OR Mania USA, Inc.. (Suarez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/28 5:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. Replies due by 11/4/2022. (Murray, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Tue 10/18 3:59 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 10/18/2022. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
6 6 motion Remand to State Court Fri 10/14 5:18 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by OR Mania USA, Inc..(Suarez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Exhibit B in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Exhibit C in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 4 Exhibit D in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 5 Exhibit E in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 6 Affidavit Suarez Declaration in Support of Motion to Remand
5 5 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/14 5:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by OR Mania USA, Inc.. Replies due by 10/21/2022.(Suarez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A in Support of Opposition of Motion to Transfer
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 10/14 4:54 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,, by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. (Murray, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/04 6:09 PM
MOTION Motion to Transfer by CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon Retail USA, LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC. (Murray, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15994832, filed by Carbon Retail USA, LLC, CYNTHIA CHOWDHURY, Noizz Florida Mall, LLC, Mania Premium Outlet International Dr, LLC, Carbon Pembroke Lakes Mall LLC, Carbon San Juan LLC, Carbon Coastland Center LLC, Carbon International Plaza LLC, Mania Florida Mall, LLC, Noizz Premium Outlet International Dr. LLC, Noizz Topanga Mall, LLC, Carbon Jean Company LLC, Carbon Altamonte Mall LLC, Carbon Florida Mall LLC, ELIOR PEREZ, Mania Topanga Mall, LLC, MANIA PREMIUM OUTLET VINELAND AVE. LLC, Carbon Houston Galleria LLC, Mania Retail U.S.A., LLC, Noizz Sawgrass Mills, LLC.(Murray, Jason) Modified Attachment Descriptions on 10/4/2022 (nan).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit - State Court Complaint & Other State Court Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit, No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed.