New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:22-cv-08477
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2022
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024

Debtor
Pretty Girl, Inc.

,
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 4:56 AM EDT
Appellant
165-24 Jamaica Ave Corp.
Represented By
Andrew Lawrence Kincaid
Oved & Oved LLP
contact info
Appellee
Salvatore LaMonica
Represented By
Gary F. Herbst
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
In Re
Pretty Girl, Inc.


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 05, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Case Stay Lifted Mon 02/05 4:07 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' settlement agreement, see ECF No. 18, the appeals pending from the bankruptcy proceedings are dismissed. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close all of the above cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/5/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
13 13 order Memo Endorsement Tue 09/05 11:48 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (15 in 1:22-cv-08476-JGK) Letter filed by 72 Fashion Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/03/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
12 12 order Endorsed Letter Wed 07/05 3:39 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew L. Kincaid dated 7/3/2023 re: reached settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The argument of the appeals is adjourned sine die. The appeals are stayed until September 5, 2023. The parties should promptly advise the Court is any developments. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/5/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 07/06 9:42 AM
Case Stayed (See entry 14 in case 22-cv-8476). (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/09 12:05 PM
ORDER: The appellant is directed to submit courtesy copies of all papers filed in connection with the pending fully briefed bankruptcy appeal. This Order shall be entered in the following related actions: 22 civ 8477, 22 civ 8480, 22 civ 8491, 22 civ 8507, 22 civ 8517, 22 civ 8508, 22 civ 8528, 22 civ 8509, 22 civ 8512, 22 civ 8514, 22 civ 8522, and 22 civ 8526. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/9/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
10 10 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Wed 02/08 6:02 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by 165-24 Jamaica Ave Corp...(Kincaid, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
9 9 appeal Appellees Brief Wed 01/18 3:52 PM
Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Salvatore LaMonica. Appellant Reply Brief due by 2/1/2023..(Seidman, Lon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Volume 1, SA-000001 to SA-000115,
Att: 2 Appendix Volume 1, SA-000116 to SA-000236,
Att: 3 Appendix Volume 1, SA-000237 to SA-000358,
Att: 4 Appendix Volume 1, SA-000359 to SA-000480,
Att: 5 Appendix Volume 2, SA-000481 to SA-000595,
Att: 6 Appendix Volume 2, SA-000596 to SA-000717,
Att: 7 Appendix Volume 2, SA-000718 to SA-000837,
Att: 8 Appendix Volume 2, SA-000838 to SA-000960,
Att: 9 Appendix Volume 3, SA-000961 to SA-001080,
Att: 10 Appendix Volume 3, SA-001081 to SA-001207
Monday, December 19, 2022
8 8 misc Letter Mon 12/19 2:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lon J. Seidman dated 12/19/2022 re: Appellee's Briefs will be filed on or before January 18, 2023. Document filed by Salvatore LaMonica..(Seidman, Lon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/14 12:36 PM
ORDER: On October 11, 2022, this Court entered an Order directing the appellee to respond to the appellant's brief by November 29, 2022. See ECF No. 4. The Court entered the same Order in each of the related cases listed on the docket in this lead case, No. 22-cv-8476. To date, the appellee has not responded to any of the appellants' briefs in this case or in the related cases. The time for the appellee to respond is extended to January 18, 2023. Replies are due on February 8, 2023. If there is no response, the appeal will be decided on the current papers. This Order shall be entered in the following related actions: 22 civ 8477, 22 civ 8480, 22 civ 8491, 22 civ 8507, 22 civ 8517, 22 civ 8508, 22 civ 8528, 22 civ 8509, 22 civ 8512, 22 civ 8514, 22 civ 8522, and 22 civ 8526. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/14/2022) ( Reply to Response to Brief due by 2/8/2023., Responses to Brief due by 1/18/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
6 6 appeal Appellants Brief Tue 11/08 8:43 PM
Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by 165-24 Jamaica Ave Corp.. Appellee Brief due by 12/8/2022..(Kincaid, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix Volume I,
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix Volume III,
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix Volume III
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/11 4:56 PM
ORDER It is hereby ordered that: 1) The appellant shall serve and file a brief with any supporting papers by November 8, 2022 2) Response(s) to the appellant's brief shall be served and filed by November 29, 2022. 3) Any replies to the response(s) shall be served and filed by December 13, 2022. The Court will contact the parties shortly thereafter for oral argument. This order shall be entered in the following related actions: 22 civ 8477, 22 civ 8480, 22 civ 8491, 22 civ 8507, 22 civ 8517, 22 civ 8508, 22 civ 8528, 22 civ 8509, 22 civ 8512, 22 civ 8514, 22 civ 8522 and 22 civ 8526. SO ORDERED. (Appellant Brief due by 11/8/2022., Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/13/2022., Appellee Brief due by 11/29/2022.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/11/2022) (jca) Modified on 10/11/2022 (jca). Modified on 10/11/2022 (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
4 4 appeal Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Fri 10/07 12:12 PM
DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re:1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant 165-24 Jamaica Ave Corp..(bkar)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Fri 10/07 8:43 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-08476-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 10/07 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 10/07 9:21 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (aea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 10/05 4:40 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-08476-JGK. Document filed by 165-24 Jamaica Ave Corp...(Kincaid, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/05 1:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Wed 10/05 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Sean H. Lane dated August 25, 2022. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 16-1151A, 14-B-11979 (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by 165-24 Jamaica Ave Corp..(bkar)
Related: [-]
utility Bankruptcy Appeal Referred as Possibly Related/Similar - Crt Wed 10/05 1:15 PM
BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 22-cv-8476. (bkar)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 10/05 1:15 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement Wed 10/05 4:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Andrew Lawrence Kincaid, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]