Minnesota District Court
Judge:Michael J Davis
Referred: John F Docherty
Case #: 0:22-cv-02465
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2022
Terminated:Nov 21, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 04, 2023 4:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Amy M Sieben
Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP
contact info
Bradley D Fisher
Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP
contact info
Sydney O Burden
Schuckit & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lindsay Riggs
Represented By
Catrina E Smith
Madgett Law
contact info
Catrina Eom Smith
Madgett Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, November 21, 2022
15 15 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 11/21 1:59 PM
JUDGMENT(ACH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/21 10:59 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Lindsay Riggs against Defendant Trans Union, LLC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff Lindsay Riggs and Defendant Trans Union, LLC shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/21/2022.(GRR)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
13 13 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 11/18 8:51 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Burden, Sydney)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/18 8:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC by Trans Union LLC. Jointly Signed by Lindsay Riggs. (Burden, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
order Order/Notice to Attorney Mon 11/14 11:55 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT - RESPOND TO COURT: The Court is in receipt of the Notice of Settlement in this matter (Dkt. No.9 ). The parties are directed to file a Stipulation for Dismissal or a joint update on the settlement finalization process on or before December 12, 2022. Pending filing of a Stipulation for Dismissal or status update, all deadlines in this case are stayed Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/14/2022.(MTB)
Related: [-]
order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 11/14 12:01 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: The parties have notified the Court that settlement has been reached in this matter. Therefore, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 is CANCELED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/14/2022.(MTB)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 11/11 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement with Trans Union by Lindsay Riggs (Smith, Catrina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 11/01 10:58 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Lindsay Riggs. Jointly Signed by Trans Union, LLC.(Smith, Catrina)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
7 7 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 10/14 6:09 PM
ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 04:00 PM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/14/2022.(MME)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Rule 26 Template
Thursday, October 13, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/13 10:02 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Burden, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/12 11:02 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sydney O Burden for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/12/2022. (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Mon 10/10 8:47 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sydney O. Burden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9812550 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 10/10 8:46 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 10/07 12:44 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-2465 MJD/JFD. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 10/06 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9807492) filed by Trans Union, LLC. No summons requested. (Fisher, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet