Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:James R Sweeney II
Referred: Tim A Baker
Case #: 1:22-cv-01974
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 04, 2023 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
HOLLI SULLIVAN
Represented By
Bingxin Lu
Office Of Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Aaron M. Ridlen
Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By
Bingxin Lu
Office Of Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Jefferson S. Garn
Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Aaron M. Ridlen
Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER REINOEHL
51860 CHERYL DR.
GRANGER, IN 46530
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CHRISTI JACOBSEN
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
PAUL ZIRIAX
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Tracy Neel
Oklahoma Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
JOHN WOBENSMITH
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
SHIRLEY N. WEBER
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
COREY STAPLETON
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
ANDREW J. SPANO
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Daniel R. LeCours
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Elliot Hallak
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN B. SCOTT
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
BRAD J. RAFFENSPERGER
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Lee M. Stoy, Jr
Office Of The Georgia Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO PADILLA
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
JOHN MERRILL
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Charles Arthur McKay
Office Of The Attorney General - Alabama
contact info
Defendant
BERNADETTE MATTHEWS
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
LAUREL M. LEE
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
RUTH R. HUGHS
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
KATIE M. HOBBS
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
WILLIAM GALVIN
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
SHEMIA P. FAGAN
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
BEVERLY A. CLARNO
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Brian Simmonds Marshall
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
LEIGH M. CHAPMAN
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Stephen Kovatis
Pa Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
BARBARA CEGAVSKE
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Sabrena Clinton
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
ANTHONY J. CASALE
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Daniel R. LeCours
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Elliot Hallak
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Defendant
CORD BYRD
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Defendant
KATHY BOOCKVAR
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Stephen Kovatis
Pa Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
JOCELYN F. BENSON
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Joseph Ho
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
KAREN B. BELL
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Mary Carla Babb
Nc Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
JOHN R. ASHCROFT
Terminated: 01/10/2023
Represented By
Jesus Armando Osete
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2022 9:43 PM EST
Thursday, October 06, 2022
1 1 39 pgs COMPLAINT against JOHN R. ASHCROFT, KAREN B. BELL, JOCELYN F. BENSON, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CORD BYRD, ANTHONY J. CASALE, BARBARA CEGAVSKE, LEIGH M. CHAPMAN, BEVERLY A. CLARNO, SHEMIA P. FAGAN, WILLIAM GALVIN, KATIE M. HOBBS, RUTH R. HUGHS, CHRISTI JACOBSEN, CONNIE LAWSON, LAUREL M. LEE, BERNADETTE MATTHEWS, JOHN MERRILL, ALEJANDRO PADILLA, BRAD J. RAFFENSPERGER, JOHN B. SCOTT, ANDREW J. SPANO, COREY STAPLETON, HOLLI SULLIVAN, SHIRLEY N. WEBER, JOHN WOBENSMITH, PAUL ZIRIAX, filed by JENNIFER REINOEHL. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 2031)(DRB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Summons Issued as to JOHN R. ASHCROFT, KAREN B. BELL, JOCELYN F. BENSON, KATHY BOOCKVAR, CORD BYRD, ANTHONY J. CASALE, BARBARA CEGAVSKE, LEIGH M. CHAPMAN, BEVERLY A. CLARNO, SHEMIA P. FAGAN, WILLIAM GALVIN, KATIE M. HOBBS, RUTH R. HUGHS, CHRISTI JACOBSEN, CONNIE LAWSON, LAUREL M. LEE, BERNADETTE MATTHEWS, JOHN MERRILL, ALEJANDRO PADILLA, BRAD J. RAFFENSPERGER, JOHN B. SCOTT, ANDREW J. SPANO, COREY STAPLETON, HOLLI SULLIVAN, SHIRLEY N. WEBER, JOHN WOBENSMITH, PAUL ZIRIAX. (DRB)
Related: [-]
3 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB)
Related: [-]