Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00108
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2022
Last checked: Friday Oct 07, 2022 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Sami Hayyat (1)
Represented By
Steven L. Barth, AFPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan Ophardt, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/07/2022 4:54 AM EDT
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Sami Hayyat. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 9/29/2022. (eh) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joshua Otey
2 2 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Sami Hayyat. (eh) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 ORDER Appointing FPD for Sami Hayyat. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/30/2022. (hbc) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Initial Appearance as to Sami Hayyat held on 9/30/2022. Present by video conference are AUSA Jonathan Ophardt for the gov't, AFPD Steven Barth for deft, deft from Marble Valley, and W. Frasure for USPO. || Court inquires of deft re consent to participate in hearing by video conference. Deft confirms that after conferring with counsel, deft waives the right to an in-person appearance and consents to participate by video. || Court informs deft of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed. Court makes inquiries and informs deft of the Complaint. Gov't moves for detention and requests a continuance. ORAL ORDER: Consistent with Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f), Court confirms disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland and possible consequences of violating such Order. ORDERED: Court appoints counsel on behalf of deft. Deft remains detained pending a Detention Hearing set for 10/5/2022 at 11:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Sami Hayyat. (Document image is sealed) (hbc) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Sami Hayyat. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 9/30/2022. (hbc) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Sami Hayyat. Detention Hearing set for 10/5/2022 at 11:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 9/30/2022. (hbc) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven L. Barth, AFPD appearing for Sami Hayyat .(Barth, Steven) [2:22-mj-00126-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
9 9 INDICTMENT as to Sami Hayyat (1) count(s) 1. (law)
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Arraignment and Detention Hearing as to Sami Hayyat held on 10/5/2022. AUSA Matthew Lasher present for the gov't, deft present with AFPD Steven Barth, and W. Frasure present for USPO. Deft sworn and Court makes inquiries. Court reads Indictment and deft enters plea of not guilty. Gov't reports on nature and extent of discovery. Statements by counsel re time required for filing pretrial motions. Court makes findings. Gov't moves for detention. Arguments by counsel. Court makes findings. ORDERED: Pretrial Motions to be filed by 1/3/2023.2 MOTION for Detention is granted. Deft is detained pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc)
Related: [-]
11 11 CRIMINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Sami Hayyat. Motions due by 1/3/2023. Time excluded from 10/5/2022 to 1/3/2023. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 10/5/2022. (hbc)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Sami Hayyat. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 10/5/2022. (hbc)
Related: [-]