Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00082
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2022
Terminated:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 19, 2022 6:19 AM EST
Defendant
Richard K Davis (5)
Represented By
Rachel L Wolf
Law Office Of Rachel Wolf
contact info
Defendant
Henry P Eaton (6)
Represented By
Christopher Rodgers
Law Office Of Kit Rodgers
contact info
Defendant
Curtis A Lloyd (4)
Defendant
Amber M Parker (1)
Represented By
Benjamin Gerald Sharp
Federal Defender Services Of Eastern Tennessee, Inc. (knox)
contact info
Defendant
Nathan B Parker (2)
Represented By
Randall E. Reagan
Law Office Of Randall Reagan
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brent Nelson Jones
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info

GPO Mar 15 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jenny L Wattenbarger: Time excluded from 3/13/2023 until 7/18/2023. Granting 78 MOTION to Continue Trial and Deadlines filed by Jenny L Wattenbarger. Plea Agreement due by 6/16/2023. Jury Trial reset from 4/4/2023 to 7/18/2023 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 3/14/2023. (JDH)

Docket last updated: 01/04/2025 8:02 AM EST

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.