Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Harry D Leinenweber
Case #: 1:22-cv-05506
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 4:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Elizabeth Dory
Donohue Brown Mathewson & Smyth LLC
contact info
Mark Howard Boyle
Donohue Brown Mathewson & Smyth LLC
contact info
Randall Edwards
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Kurt Wm Hemr
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Matthew D Powers
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Michael W. McTigue, Jr.
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James L. Kopecky
Kopecky Schumahcer Rosenburg LLC
contact info
Meredith C Slawe
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Emily Elizabeth Dory
Donohue Brown Mathewson & Smyth LLC
contact info
Mark Howard Boyle
Donohue Brown Mathewson & Smyth LLC
contact info
Randall Edwards
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Kurt Wm Hemr
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Matthew D Powers
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Michael W. McTigue, Jr.
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James L. Kopecky
Kopecky Schumahcer Rosenburg LLC
contact info
Meredith C Slawe
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Burton
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Waisnor
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Shannon K Tully
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Melissa H. Nafash
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grant Grinnell
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Waisnor
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Shannon K Tully
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Melissa H. Nafash
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle Jones
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Waisnor
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Shannon K Tully
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Melissa H. Nafash
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhonda McCallum
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Waisnor
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Shannon K Tully
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Melissa H. Nafash
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Providencia Villegas
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Waisnor
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Shannon K Tully
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Wallrich
Represented By
Mark Richard Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Waisnor
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
Shannon K Tully
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Melissa H. Nafash
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 12 2023
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/12/2023: Mailed notice(maf)

Docket last updated: 09/26/2023 7:21 AM CDT
Friday, October 07, 2022
1 1 11 pgs PETITION to Compel Arbitration(Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - List of Individual Petitioners,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - In-Box Terms & Conditions,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - EULA,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Terms & Conditions with Samsung Electronics,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Terms & Conditions on Samsung's Website,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - AAA Consumer Rules,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Example Notice Letter Petitioners Sent Samsung,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Letter and Staff Engineer Affidavit,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Letter Petitioners' Counsel Sent to Samsung's Counsel,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Representative Sample of Demand,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Confirmation from AAA,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - AAA Invoice,
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Payment Confirmation Sent to AAA,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Samsung Response Letter,
Att: 16 Exhibit O - Petitioners' Letter Response,
Att: 17 Exhibit P - AAA Email Cancelling Call,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Order Compelling Arbitration in Vasadi,
Att: 19 Exhibit R - Order Compelling Arbitration in Schmidt,
Att: 20 Exhibit S - Samsung's Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 21 Exhibit T - Order Compelling Arbitration in Velasquez-Reyes
2 2 MOTION by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Burton, Grant Grinnell, Danielle Jones, Rhonda McCallum, Providencia Villegas, Paula Wallrich to compel arbitration (Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey Burton, Grant Grinnell, Danielle Jones, Rhonda McCallum, Providencia Villegas, Paula Wallrich by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]