Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-81206

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:22-ap-80276
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2022
Terminated:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
15 Bull Street, Suite 200
Savannah, GA 31401
Plaintiff
Ulonda Barker
913 Hillwood Dr. SW
Decatur, AL 35601
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Thursday, April 06, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/06 9:41 AM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-80276 Closed (mmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 03/23 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
32 32 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/21 4:05 PM
Order Denying Motion To Approve Compromise and Settlement; Dismissing Adversary Proceeding; and Vacating Status Conference Signed on 3/21/2023. (tcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
31 31 motion Compensation Mon 03/20 3:36 PM
Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 8/24/2022 to 4/24/2023, Fee: $6,000.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Mon 03/20 3:35 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation under Rule 9019 and Approval of Attorney's Fee Filed by Plaintiff Ulonda Barker (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 03/10 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Wed 03/08 4:21 PM
Order Scheduling Status Conference Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §105(a) Signed on 3/8/2023. Status hearing to be held on 4/5/2023 at 11:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 01/19 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order (Generic)
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Tue 01/17 9:10 AM
Order Vacating Status Conference and All Remaining Deadlines Signed on 1/17/2023. (tcw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
25 25 misc Report to Court Fri 01/13 10:48 AM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Ulonda Barker, Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 12/15 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order and Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
23 23 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing Tue 12/13 9:11 AM
Order Approving Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Application for Entry of Default and Response. Signed on 12/13/2022 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 2/1/2023 at 11:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (bng)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker, Plaintiff Ulonda Barker
Monday, December 12, 2022
22 22 motion Continue Hearing Mon 12/12 10:19 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Ulonda Barker, Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Hearing, 17 Hearing Scheduled, 18 Hearing Scheduled
Sunday, December 11, 2022
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 12/11 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Friday, December 09, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 12/09 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Hearing
19 19 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Fri 12/09 10:07 AM
Order Continuing Briefing Deadline and Status Conference Signed on 12/9/2022. Status hearing to be held on 2/1/2023 at 11:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (tcw)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing Scheduled Fri 12/09 10:03 AM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 1/4/2023 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (tcw)
Related: [-] 15 Response filed by Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker, Plaintiff Ulonda Barker
Thursday, December 08, 2022
17 17 court Hearing Scheduled Thu 12/08 5:03 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 1/4/2023 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (tcw)
Related: [-] 14 Reply filed by Counter-Claimant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc., Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
16 16 motion Continue Hearing Thu 12/08 4:24 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Ulonda Barker, Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 8 Order and Notice of Status Conference
15 15 answer Response Thu 12/08 12:43 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Ulonda Barker, Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] Item:12 Response filed by Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker, Plaintiff Ulonda Barker,14 Reply filed by Counter-Claimant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc., Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
14 14 answer Reply Wed 12/07 3:57 PM
Reply to Related [+] Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Entry of Default Filed by Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc., Counter-Claimant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc. (Bowen, Charles)
Related: [-] Item:12
13 13 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Wed 12/07 3:10 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 1/4/2023 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (bng)
Related: [-] 11 Application for Entry of Default filed by Counter-Claimant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc., Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.,12 Response filed by Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker, Plaintiff Ulonda Barker
12 12 answer Response Wed 12/07 10:57 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Ulonda Barker, Counter-Defendant Ulonda Barker (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] Item:11 Application for Entry of Default (related documents7 ) filed by Counter-Claimant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc., Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
11 11 motion Entry of Default Tue 12/06 1:08 PM
Application for Entry of Default Related [+] Filed by Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc., Counter-Claimant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc. (Bowen, Charles)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Charles J. Bowen
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default
Monday, November 28, 2022
10 10 court Return Mail Mon 11/28 3:40 PM
Return Mail Related [+]. (bng)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/16 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Monday, November 14, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Mon 11/14 3:20 PM
Order (1) Requiring Affidavits and Briefs; and (2) Scheduling Status Conference Signed on 11/14/2022. Status hearing to be held on 1/4/2023 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (bng)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
7 7 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 11/11 1:13 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by TitleMax of Alabama, Inc. against Ulonda Barker Filed by TitleMax of Alabama, Inc..(Bowen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Pawn Transaction and Certificate of Title
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Payment History
Friday, November 04, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 11/04 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/04/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
5 5 order Extend Time Wed 11/02 9:27 AM
Order Approving Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Signed on 11/2/2022. (bng)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Extend Time Wed 11/02 6:35 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendant TitleMax of Alabama, Inc. (Bowen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/11 11:46 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued TitleMax of Alabama, Inc. Date Issued 10/6/2022, Answer Due 11/7/2022 (bng)
Thursday, October 06, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Thu 10/06 3:47 PM
Summons Issued TitleMax of Alabama, Inc. Date Issued 10/6/2022, Answer Due 11/7/2022 (bng)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/06 1:41 PM
Adversary case 22-80276 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Ulonda Barker against TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Alabama Pawn Ticket and Security Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - BNC Certificate of Notice 8-3-22
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - TitleMax Calls
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - BNC Certificate of Notice 9-30-22