Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Kenneth G Gale
Case #: 2:22-cv-02408
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2022
Terminated:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 4:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Ryan Dammar
Represented By
Michael S. Gardner
Gardner Haas, PLLC
contact info
Jennifer Helen Salva
Kuckelman Torline Kirkland
contact info
Jeremy R. Wilson
Gardner Haas, PLLC
contact info
Michael J. Kuckelman
Kuckelman Torline Kirkland
contact info
Defendant
Guidepoint Security, LLC
Represented By
Marc D. Katz
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Tx
contact info
Jennifer Helen Salva
Kuckelman Torline Kirkland
contact info
Maria A. Garrett
Dla Piper Llp (us) - Tx
contact info
Michael J. Kuckelman
Kuckelman Torline Kirkland
contact info
Plaintiff
Optiv Security Inc.
Represented By
Robert J. Hingula
contact info
Isaac T. Caverly
contact info


Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Thursday, April 06, 2023
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/06 3:46 PM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Optiv Security Inc. (Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/06 3:53 PM
Civil Case Terminated per 32 . (mam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
31 31 order Order Fri 03/10 1:50 PM
ORDER. The parties have informed the Court that this matter has been resolved (in principle), although the agreement is in the process of being finalized. The parties are instructed to file their stipulation of dismissal within 30 days or, in the alternative, provide the Court with a joint email outlining the status of their settlement efforts. The parties need not submit confidential settlement to the reports to the Court by March 15, 2023, as included in the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/10/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(df)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of Service Fri 02/17 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ryan Dammar of Defendant Dammar's Discovery Responses (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of Service Wed 02/15 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Guidepoint Security, LLC of GuidePoint Security LLC's Discovery Responses (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Service Thu 01/26 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Guidepoint Security, LLC of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
27 27 order Protective Order Thu 01/05 2:51 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/5/23. (df)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings - Public Wed 12/21 10:16 AM
Corrected Deadline per 26 Scheduling Order: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 3/15/2023.(heo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
26 26 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/20 11:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 5 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 1/13/2023. Mediation deadline 4/14/2023. Discovery deadline 6/30/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Dispositive motion deadline 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/20/22. (df)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 12/20 11:32 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/20/2022. (df)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/13 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendants by Optiv Security Inc. (Caverly, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Service Fri 12/09 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Guidepoint Security, LLC of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Service Fri 12/09 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ryan Dammar of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/09 11:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures by Optiv Security Inc.. (Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/08 3:32 PM
MOTION for attorney Jeremy R. Wilson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5934806.) by Defendant Ryan Dammar Related [+](Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/08 3:29 PM
MOTION for attorney Michael S. Gardner to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5934803.) by Defendant Ryan Dammar Related [+](Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/08 3:41 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Gardner for Ryan Dammar pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy R. Wilson for Ryan Dammar pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
18 18 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 11/23 9:45 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint (attorney), by Guidepoint Security, LLC. (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
17 17 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 11/11 12:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service on Spouse by Optiv Security Inc. upon Ryan Dammar served on 10/20/2022, answer due 11/10/2022 (Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
16 16 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Tue 11/08 4:52 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 11:00 AM by Telephone KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/9/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 12/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/8/22. (cc)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 11/08 8:59 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Helen Salva on behalf of Ryan Dammar, Guidepoint Security, LLC (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/07 4:51 PM
Defendant Ryan Dammar's ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan Dammar.(Kuckelman, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 11/07 4:30 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Kuckelman on behalf of Ryan Dammar (Kuckelman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/04 1:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guidepoint Security, LLC identifying GuidePoint Security Holdings, LLC as corporate parent (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/04 1:36 PM
Original ANSWER to Complaint by Guidepoint Security, LLC.(Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
10 10 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Tue 10/18 9:06 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service on Authorized Agent by Optiv Security Inc. upon Guidepoint Security, LLC served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022 (Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/17 12:31 PM
MOTION for attorney Marc D. Katz to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5891992.) by Defendant Guidepoint Security, LLC. Related [+](Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/17 8:56 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Maria A. Garrett for Guidepoint Security, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/17/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/17 2:27 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc D. Katz for Guidepoint Security, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/17/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
6 6 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 10/14 3:53 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Kuckelman on behalf of Guidepoint Security, LLC (Kuckelman, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/14 3:50 PM
MOTION for attorney Maria A. Garrett to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5891365.) by Defendant Guidepoint Security, LLC Related [+](Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 10/14 3:48 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Helen Salva on behalf of Guidepoint Security, LLC (Salva, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
service Summons Issued Tue 10/11 9:44 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Dammar, Guidepoint Security, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/10 9:53 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Optiv Security Inc. identifying Optiv Inc. as corporate parent (Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/07 4:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Optiv Security Inc.. (Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Fri 10/07 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5886109.), filed by Optiv Security Inc..(Hingula, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Dammar Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Dammar Letter
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 10/07 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
Related: [-]