New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:22-cv-08568
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2022
Terminated:Dec 12, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
EOM Advance LLC
Represented By
Gabriel Mendelberg
Mendelberg PC
contact info
Defendant
Berel Weinberger
Represented By
Gabriel Mendelberg
Mendelberg PC
contact info
Defendant
Yes Capital Group, LLC
Represented By
Gabriel Mendelberg
Mendelberg PC
contact info
Defendant
Direct Cash Lending, LLC
Defendant
Ezra Mamiye
Plaintiff
Benchmark Builders, Inc.
Represented By
Alex David Corey
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
FTE Networks, Inc.
Represented By
Alex David Corey
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
Focus Wireless, LLC
Represented By
Alex David Corey
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jus-Com LLC
Represented By
Alex David Corey
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lateral Recovery LLC
Represented By
Alex David Corey
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Shane R. Heskin
White & Williams, Llp(philadelphia)
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
68 68 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 12/12 6:10 PM
ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have reached a settlement in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within 30 days. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/12/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 12/11 4:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Settlement Conference held on 12/11/2023. (kv)
Related: [-]