Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Patricia L Dodge
Case #: 2:22-cv-01402
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2022
Terminated:Apr 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 04, 2023 6:47 AM EDT
Defendant
GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION
Represented By
Kenneth J. Yerkes
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Christina M Janice
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Kenneth J. Yerkes
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Christina M Janice
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
THE KELLER AGENCIES
Represented By
Kenneth J. Yerkes
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Christina M Janice
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DONNAYA PRESBERRY
Represented By
Stephanie L Solomon
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
29 29 order Order Tue 05/09 3:53 PM
ORDER re28 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by THE KELLER AGENCIES, GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/9/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Tue 05/09 3:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (with Prejudice) by GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE KELLER AGENCIES. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
27 27 order Order for Administrative Case Closing Tue 04/04 12:31 PM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: In light of26 Report of Mediation advising the Court that the case has been resolved, the Clerk of Court is to mark CASE CLOSED, pending the parties filing a stipulation of dismissal. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report regarding settlement on or before May 4, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all hearings and deadlines in this case are cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/4/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr Report of Mediation Tue 04/04 11:12 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 3/29/2023. (Kushner, Louis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
25 25 6 pgs order Order Thu 03/02 8:47 AM
ORDER approving24 Stipulated Protective Order filed by THE KELLER AGENCIES, GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 3/2/2023. (spc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
24 24 misc Stipulated Protective Order Wed 03/01 12:37 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE KELLER AGENCIES. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
23 23 adr Neutral's Notice of ADR Proceeding Thu 01/19 11:27 AM
Notice of ADR proceeding: The litigants are advised that at the conclusion of the ADR process they must submit a completed questionnaire to the Clerk of Courts. The questionnaire is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov and click on the ADR icon. Mediation Conference set for 3/29/2023 10:00 AM (Kushner, Louis)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Thu 01/19 10:34 AM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/19/2023. (spc)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Case Management Order Thu 01/19 10:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Supplemental ADR Stipulation due by 1/26/2023. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 2/3/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 3/17/2023; Discovery due by 9/18/2023; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/26/2023 at 09:30 AM by Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/19/2023. (spc)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 01/19 10:09 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DONNAYA PRESBERRY. (Solomon, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Thu 01/19 10:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/19/2023. A Case Management Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
18 18 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Fri 01/13 10:23 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE KELLER AGENCIES. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 01/12 9:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
16 16 misc Consent (Joint) to Proceed before US Mag. Judge Tue 01/03 4:00 PM
Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by DONNAYA PRESBERRY. (Solomon, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/13 1:28 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/5/2023, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/12/2023, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/12/2023, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 1/3/2023. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Parties will be directed to refer to the AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 12/13/2022. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 12/12 6:29 PM
Disclosure Statement by THE KELLER AGENCIES. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 12/12 6:28 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Globe Life, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/12 6:25 PM
JOINT ANSWER to1 Complaint, by GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE KELLER AGENCIES. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/27 10:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONNAYA PRESBERRY. GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION waiver sent on 10/12/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Solomon, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/27 10:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONNAYA PRESBERRY. THE KELLER AGENCIES waiver sent on 10/12/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Solomon, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Fri 10/14 3:44 PM
MOTION for attorney Kenneth J. Yerkes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7345420) by GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kenneth J. Yerkes
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Fri 10/14 10:39 AM
MOTION for attorney Christina M. Janice to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7344072) by GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christina M. Janice
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/14 12:33 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Christina M. Janice to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 10/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/14 4:13 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Kenneth J. Yerkes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 10/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/13 12:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONNAYA PRESBERRY. LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 10/12/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Solomon, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/11 8:32 AM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 10/11/2022. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/07 10:15 AM
Summons Issued as to LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE KELLER AGENCIES (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, October 06, 2022
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 10/07 9:33 AM
COMPLAINT against GLOBE LIFE LIBERTY NATIONAL DIVISION, LIBERTY NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE KELLER AGENCIES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7332343), filed by DONNAYA PRESBERRY. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet