Montana District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00099
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 08, 2022 1:37 AM MDT
Defendant
Patrick Lynn Fischer (1)
Represented By
Gillian E. Gosch
Federal Defenders Of Montana - Billings
contact info
Leo Sanford Selvey, II
Selvey Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Thomas Godfrey
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Billings
contact info

GPO Oct 25 2023
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation as to Patrick Lynn Fischer (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the forfeiture allegation contained in the indictment is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/25/2023. (EMH)

Docket last updated: 10/08/2022 2:17 AM MDT
Thursday, September 08, 2022
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Patrick Lynn Fischer (1) count(s) 1. (AMC)
Related: [-]
2 2 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Patrick Lynn Fischer. (AMC)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs Redacted Indictment as to Patrick Lynn Fischer. (AMC)
Related: [-]