NewAge, Inc. et al v. Cooper et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10819
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10819
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-50432 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Frederick Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brent Willis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kwikclick, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NewAge, Inc.
7158 S. FLSmidth Dr. Suite 250
Midvale, UT 84047 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariix LLC
7158 S. FLSmidth Dr. Suite 250
Midvale, UT 84047 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morinda Holdings, Inc.
7158 S. FLSmidth Dr. Suite 250
Midvale, UT 84047 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morinda, Inc.
7158 S. FLSmidth Dr. Suite 250
Midvale, UT 84047 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 06/01 12:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc. (Clark, Anthony) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/01 3:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-50432 Closed (BJM) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend - Motion
Mon 05/01 2:24 PM
Third Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Clark, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order) | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Completion of Briefing - Notice
Wed 03/15 9:45 AM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Reply
Wed 03/08 8:05 PM
Reply Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Extend Time
Thu 03/02 12:11 PM
Order Granting Plaintiffs Second Motion To Extend Time For Service Of Complaint And Summons Order Signed on 3/2/2023. (CMB) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/01 8:05 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Kwikclick, Inc.. (Doughty, Kristi) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Response
Wed 03/01 7:39 PM
Response in Opposition of the Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint and Summons Filed by Kwikclick, Inc. (Doughty, Kristi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Tue 02/28 6:12 AM
Certificate of No Objection re: Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend - Motion
Fri 02/10 4:57 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Clark, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order) | ||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Extend Time
Mon 01/30 2:12 PM
Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summon Order Signed on 1/30/2023. (CMB) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Wed 01/25 9:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend - Motion
Wed 12/28 5:39 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 12/27 10:31 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 21, 2022 at 10:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) (Docket No. 11) . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Leave to File Reply
Thu 12/22 8:36 AM
Order Granting Motion of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP and Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for Dr. Frederick W. Cooper . Signed on 12/21/2022. (SJS) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
audio
Wed 12/21 11:35 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [12/21/2022 10:01:34 AM]. File Size [ 0 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:45:37 ]. (admin) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv)
Wed 12/21 8:38 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/20 12:55 PM
Certificate of Service for Motion of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP and Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for Dr. Frederick W. Cooper Filed by Frederick Cooper, Frederick W. Cooper. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Thu 12/15 3:20 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Kirkland & Ellis International LLP and Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for Dr. Frederick W. Cooper Filed by Frederick Cooper, Frederick W. Cooper. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
motion
Leave - Motion
Tue 12/06 12:13 PM
Motion for Leave Motion of Kirkland & Ellis International LLP and Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for Dr. Frederick W. Cooper Filed by Frederick Cooper, Frederick W. Cooper. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/14/2022. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/15 5:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Frederick Cooper, Kwikclick, Inc., Brent Willis, Mark Wilson. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 10/13 10:43 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Marc T. Rasich Order Signed on 10/13/2022. (LJJ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 10/13 10:43 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Gregory S. Bombard Order Signed on 10/13/2022. (LJJ) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 10/10 3:35 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Marc T. Rasich, Esq. . Receipt Number 3978381, Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 10/10 3:33 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Gregory S. Bombard, Esq . Receipt Number 3978381, Filed by Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc., NewAge, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 10/07 3:36 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50432 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10877532, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
51
pgs
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/07 3:21 PM
Adversary case 22-50432 Complaint by NewAge, Inc., Ariix LLC, Morinda Holdings, Inc., Morinda, Inc. against Frederick Cooper, Mark Wilson, Brent Willis, Kwikclick, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/5/2023. (Clark, Anthony) |