Viet Huynh v. Global Processing Services, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:22-cv-01844 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 2:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Global Processing Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jalpha Powell
|
|
Defendant
James Powell
|
|
Plaintiff
Viet Huynh
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 02/15/2023
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
judgmentCV
Judgment - Default by Judge
Thu 03/23 3:56 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney35 . JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff Viet Huynh for a total of $8,635.50($2,000.00 in statutory damages for the FDCPA violation, $6,480.50 in attorneys' fees, and $155.00 in costs) against Defendants Global Processing Services, James Powell, and Jalpha Powell in accordance with the Court's Order granting Plaintiff s motion for default judgment. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 03/22 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT re Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,36(Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/16 3:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: GRANTING IN SUBSTANTIAL PART35 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment (Dkt. 35). For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion for default judgment is GRANTED IN SUBSTANTIAL PART. The Court enters a total judgment of $8635.50 ($2,000 in statutory damages for the FDCPA violation, $6480.50 in attorneys fees, and $155 in costs). Plaintiff shall submit a proposed judgment within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Case Terminated. MD JS-6. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 02/15 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants GLOBAL PROCESSING SERVICES, LLC, JALPHA POWELL, and JAMES POWELL filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. Motion set for hearing on 3/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum PLAINTIFFS MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Wed 02/15 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Does. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
order
Enlargement of Time to File
Tue 02/07 3:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extend Time to File For Default Judgment. Plaintiff must file a Motion for Default Judgment on or before 2/15/23. (twdb) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Enlargement of Time to File Document
Mon 01/30 7:50 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 01/24 2:12 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On 01/17/2023 and 01/24/2023, the clerk entered default as to defendants20 and29 . Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment within one week of this order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Tue 01/24 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The address is not missing and is at the bottom of page(s) #23, 24. Re: Deficiency - Default (CV-52b)28 . (twdb) |
|
29 | 29
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Tue 01/24 1:49 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Global Processing Services, LLC, Jalpha Powell (twdb) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Tue 01/24 9:49 AM
[SEE G-11 #30] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Global Processing Services, LLC26 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Jalpha Powell27 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. See #22 (twdb) Modified on 1/24/2023 (twdb) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Mon 01/23 6:32 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Jalpha Powell filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
26 | 26
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Mon 01/23 6:29 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Global Processing Services, LLC filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 01/23 10:19 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),23 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
24 | 24
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 01/23 5:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Powell, Husband in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
23 | 23
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 01/23 4:45 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Powell, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Tue 01/17 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Global Processing Services, LLC14 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Jalpha Powell18 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof(s) of service #13 and #17 are missing an address for place of service as to the person served. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (twdb) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Tue 01/17 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Default by Clerk entered in error. The proof of service #13 is lacking information. Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)19 . (twdb) |
|
20 | 20
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Tue 01/17 11:43 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to James Powell (twdb) |
|
19 | 19
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Tue 01/17 11:40 AM
[ENTERED IN ERROR SEE #21] DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to GLOBAL PROCESSING SERVICES, LLC (twdb) Modified on 1/17/2023 (twdb) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 01/13 11:22 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Jalpha Powell filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
17 | 17
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/13 11:13 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh, upon Defendant Jalpha Powell served on 12/17/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Powell, Husband in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 01/13 11:03 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant James Powell filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/13 10:54 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh, upon Defendant James Powell served on 12/17/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Powell in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 01/13 10:50 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Global Processing Services, LLC filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/13 10:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh, upon Defendant Global Processing Services, LLC served on 12/17/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Powell, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/11 4:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Here, 90 days have passed since Plaintiff filed the Complaint, yet no proof of service has been filed. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than January 13, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by Plaintiff, the Court will consider as an appropriate response to this OSC the filing of one of the following on or before the above date: 1. A Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, or 2. A Proof of Service indicating service of the Summons and Complaint was effected on or before January 5, 2023. However, if the deadline to answer has passed by the time Plaintiff files the proof of service, the response to this Order will be deemed sufficient only if one of the following is also filed: a. Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default as to Defendants or Defendants' Answers, or b. A stipulation extending Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint that complies with Local Rule 8.3. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 11/15 9:33 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant James Powell. (hr) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 11/15 9:32 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Jalpha Powell. (hr) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 11/15 9:31 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Global Processing Services, LLC. (hr) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 11/14 10:12 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting4 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case) 7 . (twdb) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 11/10 5:47 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/13 1:22 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)4 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 10/12 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error this case was assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, this case has been randomly assigned Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Re: Add and Terminate Judges the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-01844 CJC(ADSx). (rn) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Fri 10/07 6:55 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 10/07 6:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh.(Amador, Ramo) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 10/07 6:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Amador, Ramo) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/07 6:49 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Viet Huynh. (Attorney Ramo Robert Amador added to party Viet Huynh(pty:pla))(Amador, Ramo) |