Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Katherine A Crytzer
Referred: Susan K Lee
Case #: 4:22-cv-00049
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2022
Terminated:May 08, 2024
Defendant
Ashley Rambo
Defendant
Dannie Glover
Defendant
Jackie Matheny Jr
Defendant
Tommy Meyers
Defendant
Warren County, Tennessee
Plaintiff
Matthew Collins

GPO Jun 26 2023
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, the Court DENIES Defendant Dr. Glover's "Motion to Dismiss" 12. Signed by District Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 6/26/23. (ADA)
GPO May 08 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court (1) GRANTS Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension [Doc. 43], (2) GRANTS Defendants' motions for summary judgment [Docs. 36, 39], and (3) DISMISSES this action. A Judgment Order shall issue. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 5/7/2024. (BJL)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
82 82 appeal USCA Order Wed 04/30 2:25 PM
ORDER of USCA as to77 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Collins. The proper fee was not paid by April 09, 2025. It is therefore ORDERED that this cause be, and it hereby is, dismissed for want of prosecution. (BJL)
Related: [-]