California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:22-cv-05852
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2022
Terminated:Nov 10, 2022
Case in other court:Alameda, 22CV017191
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 1:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Performance Food Group, Inc.
Represented By
Natalie Michelle Lagunas
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Andrew William Russell
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info
Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Sarah Yoonhae Oh
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcos Rodriguez
Represented By
Jackland K. Hom
Zakay Law Group, Aplc
contact info
Shani O. Zakay
Zakay Law
contact info
Jean-Claude Lapuyade
Jcl Law Firm, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Thursday, November 10, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/10 12:26 PM
ORDER re 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The operative dismissal does not require the courts approval under Rule 41. The Clerk of the Court will close the file. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/10/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/09 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marcos Rodriguez(Hom, Jackland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 11/09 9:12 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Performance Food Group, Inc... (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 11/08 1:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/22/2022 . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/5/2023 is reset to 1/19/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar . Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.us courts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 10/11 2:10 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/20 22. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 10/11 1:28 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Jean-Claude Lapuyade, Shani O. Zakay, Electronic filing error. The email address on file does not match the Notice of Appearance, ple ase update your ECF profile. Re: 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Performance Food Group, Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Performance Food Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PFGC, Inc., Corporate Parent Performance Food Group Company for Performance Food Group, Inc.. (Beldner, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV017191. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17606659). Filed by Performance Food Group, Inc..(Beldner, Sabrina) Modified on 10/11/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Tue 10/11 1:54 PM
1 - Exhibit G (pg.60) Answer to Removal Complaint by Performance Food Group, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]