California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:22-cv-07384
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2022
Terminated:Oct 20, 2022
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:22-cv-03642
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2023 3:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Stephenie Areeco
Represented By
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Bryant
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Amber Cain
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Yvonne Dougher
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Carla Haas
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Tania Harrison
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Maria Mekus
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Angela Sharbino
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Anne-Rock Smith
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Defendant
Heather Trimmer
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Alice Christine Svenson
Svenson Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Piper Rockelle Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth S Ingber
Ingber And Associates Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
P. R. S.
Represented By
Kenneth S Ingber
Ingber And Associates Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Rockelle Smith
Represented By
Ronald Lee Bell
Ronald L. Bell & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kenneth S Ingber
Ingber And Associates Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 20, 2022
24 24 1 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 10/20 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Piper Rockelle Inc., P. R. S., Tiffany Rockelle Smith. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Ingber, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs notice Appearance Thu 10/20 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kenneth S Ingber on behalf of Plaintiffs Piper Rockelle Inc., P. R. S., Tiffany Rockelle Smith (Attorney Kenneth S Ingber added to party Piper Rockelle Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth S Ingber added to party P. R. S.(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth S Ingber added to party Tiffany Rockelle Smith(pty:pla))(Ingber, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 10/19 4:52 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before October 26, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
21 21 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 10/12 2:20 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 10/12 8:12 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 10/12 8:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 10/12 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (sh)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Receipt of Case Transferred In (CV-32) - optional html form Wed 10/12 8:02 AM
NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:22-cv-03642, from Northern District of Illinois. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-07384 PA (PDx). (sh)
Related: [-]
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Wed 10/12 7:59 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Illinois Northern
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
15 15 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of California the electronic record. (cxr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
14 14 1 pgs MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The federal venue statute allows the Court, in the interest of justice, to transfer this case "to any other district or division where it might have been brought," for "the convenience of the parties and witnesses." 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Here, the parties agree that, although venue remains proper in this district, the Central District of California is the more convenient forum, as all parties live there and most of the alleged transactions occurred there. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer venue to the Central District of California12 and strikes the 10/11/22 Notice of Motion date. The Court directs the Clerk to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
13 13 3 pgs STATUS Report on Behalf of the Plaintiff's by Tiffany Rockelle Smith (Bell, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
12 12 MOTION by Defendants Stephenie Areeco, Jennifer Bryant, Amber Cain, Yvonne Dougher, Carla Haas, Tania Harrison, Maria Mekus, Angela Sharbino, Ashley Anne-Rock Smith, Heather Trimmer to transfer case UNOPPOSED(Svenson, Alice) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion
Friday, September 23, 2022
11 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Matthew Sarelson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice10 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
10 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19860755. (Sarelson, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's first amended complaint8 is granted and any response shall be filed on or before 10/10/2022. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
8 8 2 pgs MOTION by Defendants Stephenie Areeco, Jennifer Bryant, Amber Cain, Yvonne Dougher, Carla Haas, Tania Harrison, Maria Mekus, Angela Sharbino, Ashley Anne-Rock Smith, Heather Trimmer for extension of time to file answer /respond to First Amended Complaint , MOTION by Defendants Stephenie Areeco, Jennifer Bryant, Amber Cain, Yvonne Dougher, Carla Haas, Tania Harrison, Maria Mekus, Angela Sharbino, Ashley Anne-Rock Smith, Heather Trimmer for extension of time to file response/reply(Svenson, Alice) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion
7 7 2 pgs ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Stephenie Areeco, Jennifer Bryant, Amber Cain, Yvonne Dougher, Carla Haas, Tania Harrison, Maria Mekus, Angela Sharbino, Ashley Anne-Rock Smith, Heather Trimmer by Alice Christine Svenson (Svenson, Alice) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
6 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties (or Plaintiffs individually if Defendants have not yet appeared) shall file an updated status report by 9/30/22. At that time, Plaintiff should explain why this Court has personal jurisdiction over the Defendants named in the operative complaint and explain why venue is proper in this district, as it appears from the complaint that Defendants all reside in California and that all of the alleged predicate acts occurred in California. See 18 U.S.C. § 1965(a) ("Any civil action or proceeding under this chapter against any person may be instituted in the district court of the United States for any district in which such person resides, is found, has an agent, or transacts his affairs."); D'Kids Partners, LP v. Kirlin, No. 16-CV-10472, 2017 WL 6945592, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Feb. 24, 2017)("Venue under the RICO statute must be properly asserted as to each defendant."); Payne v. Mktg. Showcase, Inc., 602 F. Supp. 656, 658 (N.D. Ill. 1985) (plaintiff must show that there is venue over each defendant due to his own contacts with the district as opposed to those of a co-defendant). Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
5 5 6 pgs STATUS Report by Tiffany Rockelle Smith (Bell, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
4 4 70 pgs First AMENDED complaint by Tiffany Rockelle Smith against All Defendants Angela Sharbino et.al (Bell, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
3 3 1 pgs MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 8/29/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Stephenie Areeco, Jennifer Bryant, Yvonne Dougher, Tania Harrison, Maria Mekus, Angela Sharbino, Ashley Anne-Rock Smith, Heather Trimmer (khg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Amber Cain, Carla Haas (kra, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
2 2 RICO Case Statement STATEMENT by TIFFANY ROCKELLE-SMITH (Bell, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by TIFFANY ROCKELLE-SMITH; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19648416.(Bell, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]