Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas O Rice
Case #: 2:22-cv-00228
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2022
Terminated:Jan 04, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 10, 2023 1:32 AM PDT
Defendant
GREP Southwest, LLC, dba Greystar
Plaintiff
Gabriel Gamez
Apt HH102 12930 E Mansfield Ave
Spokane Valley, WA 99216

GPO Jan 04 2023
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
GPO Jan 04 2023
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (BF, Paralegal)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
12 12 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 01/04 11:55 AM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
11 11 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 01/04 11:53 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
10 10 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 01/03 4:16 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gabriel Gamez. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Complaint Tue 01/03 4:14 PM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT against GREP Southwest, LLC, dba Greystar (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Jury Demand. Filed by Gabriel Gamez.(BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/28 12:58 PM
MOTION to Show Authority by Gabriel Gamez. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
7 7 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 12/28 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filed by Gabriel Gamez.(BF, Paralegal) (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/28/2022) Exhibit Superior Court documents
Thursday, December 08, 2022
6 6 misc Objections Thu 12/15 1:42 PM
OBJECTION To Magistrate Judge Goeke's Order Denying Waiver of Filing Fee with Right to Renew Request by Gabriel Gamez. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/08 2:19 PM
ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF FILING FEE WITH RIGHT TO RENEW REQUEST. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order Plaintiff shall submit a properly completed Application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke.(BM, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
3 3 misc Clerk's Notice of Deficient Filing Thu 10/13 8:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING. Filing Fee due by 10/26/2022. (BM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application Form
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other Wed 10/12 12:06 PM
Request to Proceed Without Prepayment by Gabriel Gamez. (BM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/12 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT - VERIFIED PETITION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION against GREP Southwest, LLC, dba Greystar (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending). Filed by Gabriel Gamez.(BM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet