Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:22-cv-03477
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2022
Case in other court:New Jersey, 2:22-cv-05715
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 05, 2023 7:08 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-99
Defendant
ABC PUBLIC ENTITIES 1-99
Defendant
Carteret Fire Department,
Defendant
Hopelawn Fire Department
Defendant
INSURANCE AUTO ACTIONS, INC.
Defendant
ISELIN FIRE DEPARTMENT #1
Defendant
Iselin Fire Department #11
Defendant
Iselin Fire Department #9
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-99
Defendant
MIDDLESEX COUNTY FIRE MARSHALL
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Keith Edward Smith
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Defendant
Port Reading Fire Department
Defendant
State of New Jersey
Plaintiff
NEW CARSUN HILLS, LP
Represented By
LUKE J. KEALY
Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
7 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 2:22-cv-05715, New Carsun Hills, LP v. National Foam Inc. et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3477-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 10/12 11:22 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:22-cv-05715. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
4 4 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (In Re: Aqueous Film-Forms Products Litigation - MDL 2873 CTO 106 Judge Richard M. Gergel) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
3 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEW CARSUN HILLS, LP(KEALY, LUKE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 26, 2022
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL FOAM INC. identifying Angus International Safety Group Limited as Corporate Parent.. (SMITH, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL FOAM INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey - Middlesex Co., case number MID-L-004426-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13713898), filed by NATIONAL FOAM INC..(SMITH, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/12/2022.]
Related: [-]