California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-mj-03713
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Oct 13, 2022 12:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Daniel T. Lee
Federal Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Badih Mouannes
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2022 12:46 AM PDT
Sunday, October 09, 2022
Arrest of Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez.(mef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez: Initial Appearance set for 10/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (ave)
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Initial Appearance as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez held on 10/11/2022. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez. Detention Hearing as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez held on 10/11/2022. USA oral motion for detention (Flight); motion granted as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Bond set as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 10/25/22 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Arraignment set for 11/08/22 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.) (Interpreter Elizabeth Torres). (CD# 10/11/2022 BLM 22-1:2:09-3:20). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Pierce AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Soojin Cha FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/11/22. (aje)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/11/22. (aum)
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Victor Julian Ruiz-Rodriguez (aum)
Related: [-]