South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 7:22-cv-03535
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2022
Terminated:Jul 19, 2024
Case in other court:Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, 2022-CP-42-03496
Last checked: Monday Apr 10, 2023 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Dr Randall Gary
Represented By
Allen D Smith
Halligan Mahoney And Williams PA
contact info
Defendant
Spartanburg County School District Five
Represented By
Allen D Smith
Halligan Mahoney And Williams PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Tony Gillespie
Represented By
Scott F Talley
Talley Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
41 41 misc Document Mailed Fri 07/19 2:52 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,39 Summary Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Amy Cox, Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas. (alew)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Document E-Mailed Fri 07/19 2:51 PM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,39 Summary Judgment to Amy Cox, Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas. (alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Resent Email re: certified documents
39 39 misc Summary Judgment Fri 07/19 2:11 PM
SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Spartanburg County School District Five and Dr Randall Gary, Individually and in his official capacity against Plaintiff Tony Gillespie. (alew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
38 38 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 07/19 1:59 PM
OPINION and ORDER granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/18/24.(alew) Modified on 7/19/2024 to correct filing, signed date (alew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Case Number Fri 06/21 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: The new case number is 7:22-cv-03535-DCC. Please make a note of this for all future filings as well as Judge Coggins' filing preferences. (jens)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Case Reassigned CV Fri 06/21 9:13 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Change of Case Number Wed 02/14 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: The new case number is 7:22-cv-03535-JDA. Please make a note of this for all future filings as well as Judge Austin's filing preferences. (jens)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Case Reassigned CV Wed 02/14 10:35 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/17 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Spartanburg County School District Five.(Fittipaldi, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit Tony Gillespie Deposition,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit Dr. Gary's Deposition
Monday, November 13, 2023
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/13 11:08 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Tony Gillespie.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/20/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Talley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Social Media Post,
Att: 2 13 pgs Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Dr. Randall Gary,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit Social Medias Posts by District Employees,
Att: 4 Exhibit Staff Policy,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Kacy Austin,
Att: 6 Exhibit Modern Turf Post,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Heather Lister
Friday, November 03, 2023
29 29 3 pgs discov Rule 26a3 Pretrial Disclosures Only Fri 11/03 1:49 PM
RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 11/17/2023.(Fittipaldi, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
28 28 discov Rule 26a3 Pretrial Disclosures Only Thu 11/02 1:28 PM
RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Tony Gillespie. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 11/16/2023.(Talley, Scott)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Entry Deletion Thu 11/02 9:09 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 25 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number26 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 10/30/23. Response due date modified to that of original filing: 11/13/23. (alew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
26 26 motion Summary Judgment Wed 11/01 4:13 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five. Response to Motion due by 11/15/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Fittipaldi, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Defendant's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgement,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit Ex.1 Tony Gillespie Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Employment Contract 21-22 School Year,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 Kacey Austin Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 January 14, 2022 Letter,
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit Ex. 5 Text Message December 21, 2021,
Att: 7 8 pgs Exhibit Ex.6 Dr. Randall Gary Deposition,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 January 21, 2022 Letter,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 March 21, 2022 Letter,
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit Ex. 9 Email,
Att: 11 4 pgs Exhibit Ex. 10 Facebook Post,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex.11 Tweet and Email,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 Facebook Apology,
Att: 14 6 pgs Exhibit Ex. 13 Heather Lister Deposition
Monday, October 30, 2023
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Mon 10/30 10:57 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Fittipaldi, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Defendant's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/18 3:50 PM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2023, Discovery due by 9/3/2023, Mediation Due by 9/18/2023, Motions due by 10/31/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/3/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 12/4/2023. (alew)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 07/18 3:45 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend/Correct 20 Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/18/23.(alew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
21 21 motion Amend/Correct Mon 07/17 12:31 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct20 Second Amended Scheduling Order by Tony Gillespie. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Talley, Scott) Modified on 7/17/2023to add linkage (alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit-Proposed Third Amended Consent Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/31 8:15 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/1/2023, Discovery due by 8/3/2023, Motions due by 8/17/2023, Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2023, Mediation Due by 8/31/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/11/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 10/2/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/30/23. (alew, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 05/31 8:13 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/30/23.(alew, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/26 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Fittipaldi on behalf of Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five (Fittipaldi, Susan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Fri 05/26 1:59 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct8 Scheduling Order,,16 Scheduling Order,, by Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Fittipaldi, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order
Monday, February 13, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/13 12:43 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/20/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/14/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/12/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/1/2023, Discovery due by 7/3/2023, Motions due by 7/17/2023, Mediation Due by 7/31/2023, Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/11/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 10/2/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/13/23. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
misc Entry Deletion Tue 12/20 3:29 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 15 Reason: per judge's request. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
14 14 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 12/19 12:53 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Spartanburg County School District Five.(Smith, Allen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
13 13 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 12/16 11:32 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Tony Gillespie.(Talley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
minutes Pretrial Conference Tue 12/06 12:57 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: Phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit a joint proposed amended scheduling order within 14 days. The parties are further directed to submit joint responses to Local Civil Rule 26.03(A)(1-4) (D.S.C.) interrogatories within 14 days. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Mon 11/14 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Telephone Conference, Thursday December 1, 2022 @ 3:00pm cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, 12/6/2022 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. *Previous instructions remain the same (alew, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
9 9 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/04 4:04 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Thursday, December 1, 2022 3:00 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 11/4/22. (alew, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/04 3:59 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/28/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/18/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/13/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/14/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/3/2023, Discovery due by 5/3/2023, Motions due by 5/17/2023, Mediation Due by 5/31/2023, Motion in Limine due by 7/3/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/11/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 8/1/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 11/4/22. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 10/17 11:08 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tony Gillespie.(Talley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/13 1:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five.(Smith, Allen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
4 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (10/26/22). (alew, )
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 10/13 9:27 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randall Gary, Spartanburg County School District Five.(alew, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 10/13 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP 42-03496 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10744977), filed by Spartanburg County School District Five, Randall Gary.(alew, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents
notice Notice Other Thu 10/13 9:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (10/26/22). (alew, )
Related: [-]