Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-19837

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:22-ap-01336
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2022
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
New Millennium Title Agency, LLC
New Millennium Title Agency, LLC 1600 Rt., 208 North
Hawthorne, NJ 07507
Represented By
New Millennium Title Agency, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Z Joseph
95 Schoonmaker Road
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Represented By
Walter D. Nealy
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 09/14 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 09/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
17 17 order To Close Case Mon 09/11 10:35 AM
Order to Close Case (Case Number: 2:2022-ap-1336-JKS). Reason: Main Case Dismissed. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/11/2023. (zlh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jason Z Joseph
court Hearing Held Mon 09/11 10:36 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Moot Related [+] (zlh)
Related: [-] 9 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Trial date set for 9/20/2023 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 09/11 10:38 AM
Adversary Case 22-01336 JKS) Closed. (zlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
16 16 misc Document Wed 09/06 12:54 PM
Document re: Letter requesting trial adjournment filed by Howard Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC. (Mankoff, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 07/27 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
14 14 order Compel Mon 07/24 12:34 PM
Order Granting Motion To Compel Discovery. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/21/2023. (zlh)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, July 13, 2023
court Hearing Held Thu 07/13 11:45 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted. Related [+] (mff)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Compel filed by New Millennium Title Agency, LLC
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
court Notice of Docketing Error Wed 07/12 9:42 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: PROPOSED ORDER ENTERED ON DOCKET, WHEN SUBMITTING A PROPOSED ORDER, PLEASE "E-MAIL" TO CHAMBERS, DO NOT FILE ON DOCKET. (lc)
Related: [-] 13 Document filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff New Millennium Title Agency, LLC, Defendant New Millennium Title Agency, LLC
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
13 13 misc Document Tue 07/11 4:15 PM
Document re: Revised Proposed Order on Motion to Compel Discovery Related [+] filed by Howard Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC. (Mankoff, Howard) PROPOSED ORDER ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR. Modified TEXT on 7/12/2023 (lc)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Compel filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff New Millennium Title Agency, LLC, Defendant New Millennium Title Agency, LLC
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
12 12 motion Compel Tue 06/06 11:27 AM
Motion to Compel Discovery Filed by New Millennium Title Agency, LLC.Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Mankoff, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certification
Att: 3 Certification
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Saturday, February 18, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 02/19 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 02/19 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
court Hearing Held Thu 02/16 2:14 PM
Minute :OUTCOME: Pretrial hearing moot. Joint mediation Order and Joint Scheduling Order entered. Related [+] (mff)
Related: [-] 7 Summons Issued
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
9 9 order Joint Scheduling Order Thu 02/16 1:53 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Trial date set for 9/20/2023 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Mediation Order Thu 02/16 1:50 PM
Mediation Order. David G. Beslow added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2023. (mff)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
7 7 court Summons Issued Fri 02/10 8:57 AM
Third Party Summons Issued to New Millennium Title Agency, LLC for Service on Priority Search Services, LLC Answer due on 3/13/2023 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/9/2023 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (lc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Thursday, February 09, 2023
6 6 misc Support Thu 02/09 10:21 AM
Summons on Third Party Complaint in support of Related [+] filed by Howard Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC. (Mankoff, Howard)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff New Millennium Title Agency, LLC, Defendant New Millennium Title Agency, LLC, Third-Party Complaint
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
5 5 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Third-Party Complaint Wed 01/18 11:36 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Howard Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC, Third-Party Complaint by Howard Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC against Priority Search Services, LLC. (Mankoff, Howard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 01/18 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Howard Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC. (Mankoff, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 01/17 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Howard B. Mankoff on behalf of New Millennium Title Agency, LLC. (lc)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Mon 01/23 10:42 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Joint Mediation and Scheduling Order to be Submitted. Related [+] (mff)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 13, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 10/13 10:59 AM
Summons Issued to Jason Z Joseph for Service on New Millennium Title Agency, LLC Answer due on 11/14/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (lc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/12 5:02 PM
Adversary case 22-01336 Complaint by Jason Z Joseph against New Millennium Title Agency, LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Nealy, Walter)
Related: [-]