New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:22-cv-08711
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2022
Case in other court:New York Eastern, 1:22-cv-05022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 11, 2023 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Sensio Inc.
Represented By
Angelantonio Bianchi
The Law Offices Of Tobias & Kuhn
contact info
Bernice Ellen Margolis
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp (white Plains)
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Robert Douglas
Represented By
Randi Alyson Kassan
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman
contact info
Adam John Kress
Johnson Becker PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
45 45 order Order Fri 05/02 8:38 AM
ORDER regarding ECF No. 44. Pursuant to paragraph 8.E of this Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, the post-expert discovery joint status letter shall be submitted by no later than July 9, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas) (Text Only Order) (Yin-Olowu, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
44 44 misc Status Report Wed 04/30 9:03 AM
STATUS REPORT. Regarding Discovery Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
43 43 order Protective Order Tue 03/18 3:36 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 3/18/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 03/18 9:41 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
minutes Discovery Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/27 12:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas: Discovery Hearing held on 2/27/2025,( Discovery due by 6/30/2025.). Present were Adam Kress for the plaintiff, and John Zefutie and Ugo Coelella for the Defendant. The deadline for completion of all discovery is extended until June 30, 2025. The parties are directed to file a joint status letter updating the Court on the progress of discovery by April 30, 2025. (Court Reporter Doug Colavito) (nmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
misc Remark Fri 02/21 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Pretrial Conference set for February 27, 2025, at 11 AM via Microsoft TEAMS before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. See ECF No. 35 for meeting information.(nmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
41 41 misc Letter Thu 02/20 12:20 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from John J. Zefutie, Jr. and Adam J. Kress dated 2/20/25 re: Joint Status Report and Case Management Plan. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 02/19 8:51 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 39 MOTION for Ugo Colella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30638310. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 9:25 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF UGO COLELLA granting39 Motion for Ugo Colella to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 2/18/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 10:05 PM
MOTION for Ugo Colella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30638310. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Colella, Ugo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ugo Colella,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Zefutie, JR on behalf of Sensio Inc...(Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2025
37 37 order Order Sun 02/02 11:53 AM
ORDER. On January 31, 2025, counsel for Defendant filed a Proposed Order authorizing substitution of counsel. Counsel seeking to withdraw their representation must do so in accordance with Local Rule 1.4(b), which requires submission of a motion. Additionally, new counsel representing Defendant shall either file a notice of appearance in accordance with Local Rule 1.4(a) or file an appropriate motion to appear pro hac vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas) (Text Only Order) (Vargas, Jeannette)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
36 36 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 01/31 6:02 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Zefutie, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
35 35 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/21 9:28 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:33 Status Report filed by Justin Robert Douglas. Bernice E. Margolis ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference set for January 23, 2025, is adjourned to February 27, 2025, at 11 AM, EST to allow time for Defendant's incoming counsel's appearance. The Conference will be held via Microsoft Teams (Meeting ID: 231 388 059 192; Passcode: MV7DG6iA). The parties must submit a joint status report and a Civil Case Management Plan by February 20, 2025. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas.) (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 1/17/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Letter Fri 01/17 3:57 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Bernice E. Margolis dated 1/17/2025 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Margolis, Bernice) Modified on 1/17/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 01/17 1:06 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Justin Robert Douglas..(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
32 32 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/08 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Counsel for all parties shall appear for a pretrial conference with the Court on January 23, 2025 at 11:00am. The conference will be held in Courtroom 14C, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. The conference previously scheduled for January 8, 2025, is adjourned. Except as otherwise stated herein, all other prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Additionally, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, by January 17, 2025, updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall provide the following information, to the extent it is relevant, in separate paragraphs: as further set forth in this Notice. ( Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas.) (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 1/8/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 12/18 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 08/22 6:16 PM
AMENDED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. This Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is adopted, after consultation with counsel, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26(f): All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by October 19, 2024. Expert depositions shall be completed by January 8, 2025. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY January 8, 2025. The next case management conference is scheduled for January 8, 2025 at 11 a.m. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Thu 08/22 6:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Deposition due by 1/8/2025., Discovery due by 1/8/2025.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
30 30 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/21 4:52 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joohyun Kim, Esq. dated 08/21/2024. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Kim, Joohyun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Revised Scheduling Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joohyun Kim on behalf of Sensio Inc...(Kim, Joohyun)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott H, Stopnik on behalf of Sensio Inc...(Stopnik, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
27 27 order Case Management Plan Thu 02/01 11:35 AM
AMENDED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is adopted, after consultation with counsel,pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26(f): All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2024. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by July 19, 2024. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2024. Deposition due by 9/25/2024. All Discovery due by 9/25/2024. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. Katharine H. Parker. The next Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/01/2024) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
26 26 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 01/31 4:21 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Margolis, Bernice)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 01/29 3:05 PM
ORDER: granting24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The application to cancel the January 31, 2024 conference is granted. The parties are directed to submit the proposed amended scheduling order by January 31, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/29/2024) (ama)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 01/29 1:06 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam J. Kress dated 01/29/2024. Document filed by Justin Robert Douglas..(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
23 23 respoth Response (non-motion) Wed 01/24 5:21 PM
RESPONSE re:20 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam John Kress dated 12/27/2023. . Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Margolis, Bernice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/23 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE CANCELLATION: In light of the order issued on December 27, 2023, doc. 21, the case management conference scheduled for January 24, 2024, is cancelled. (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Wed 12/27 4:22 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. As defense counsel has indicated that it would not be futile to do so, the parties are directed to meet and confer to attempt to resolve the disputed discovery issues. If such further discussions are unsuccessful, the Court will hold a premotion conference on the discovery dispute on January 31, 2024 at 10 a m. by telephone. The parties are instructed to call the Court at that time at (877) 411-9748 and use access code 3029857#. In that event, Defendant is directed to file a response of no more than three pages to Plaintiff's letter (Doc. 20) by January 24, 2024. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 1/31/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/27/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Local Rule 37.2 Conference Wed 12/27 11:29 AM
LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam John Kress dated 12/27/2023. Document filed by Justin Robert Douglas..(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Responses to Requests for Admissions
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/27 4:23 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/24/2024 (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
19 19 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/05 12:27 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:18 Letter filed by Sensio Inc. ENDORSEMENT: All discovery shall be completed by January 25, 2024. The November 1, 2023 case management conference is adjourned to January 25, 2024, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Deposition due by 1/25/2024., Discovery due by 1/25/2024., Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/05/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
18 18 misc Letter Tue 10/03 5:50 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bernice E. Margolis dated 10/03/2023 re: Request for extension of discovery deadlines. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Margolis, Bernice)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
17 17 order Case Management Plan Mon 05/01 11:03 AM
CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is adopted, after consultation with counsel, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26(f): All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge,including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 5/26/2023. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by August 25, 2023. Deposition due by 10/25/2023. All Discovery due by 10/25/2023. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. Katharine H. Parker. The next Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/01/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
16 16 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 04/28 5:01 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Margolis, Bernice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/25 11:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/25/2023 by telephone. Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel present. All discovery shall be completed by October 25, 2023. A case management conference is scheduled for November 1, 2023 at 10 a.m. The parties shall submit a proposed joint case management plan by Friday, April 28, 2023. (This conference was recorded.) (jar)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/21 11:42 AM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The telephonic initial conference previously scheduled for 10:30 a.m. on April 25, 2023 is hereby rescheduled for 11:00 AM on April 25 . The parties are reminded to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/10 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bernice Ellen Margolis on behalf of Sensio Inc...(Margolis, Bernice)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/07 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: The conference will be held by telephone. The parties are instructed to call the Court at (877) 411-9748 and use access code 3029857#. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Substitution of Attorney Wed 02/15 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Anthony Bianchi, Esq., New Attorney: Bernice E. Margolis, Esq., Address: Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP, 1133 Westchester Avenue, White Plains, New York, USA 10604, 914-323-7000. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Bianchi, Angelantonio)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
12 12 discov Rule 26 Disclosure Mon 10/17 12:31 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Bianchi, Angelantonio)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/17 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angelantonio Bianchi on behalf of Sensio Inc...(Bianchi, Angelantonio)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/17 12:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Bianchi, Angelantonio)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/17 12:20 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sensio Inc...(Bianchi, Angelantonio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 10/13 1:06 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:22-cv-05022. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10/13 1:06 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice - Transfer Case Thu 10/13 1:08 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vba)
Related: [-]
misc Note to Out of State Attorneys Thu 10/13 1:08 PM
NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 10/13 1:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
ORDER -- The parties have not replied to the Courts order to show cause dated September 6, 2022. Nothing on the face of the complaint suggests that venue is proper in this district under 28 U.S.C. § 1391. Plaintiff alleges venue lies here because Defendant resides in this district, but the address Plaintiff provides for Defendant is located in the Southern District of New York. There is no indication, either, that a substantial proportion of the events giving rise to this action occurred in this district. Under these circumstances, 28 U.S.C. § 1406 dictates that this court may, if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district... in which it could have been brought. Accordingly, this case is hereby transferred to the Southern District of New York. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 10/3/2022. Case transferred to District of Southern New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. . (AG) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
7 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15991185. by Justin Robert Douglas. (Kress, Adam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelantonio Bianchi on behalf of Sensio, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bianchi, Angelantonio) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Robert Douglas. Sensio, Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
ORDER -- The complaint1 does not establish that venue lies in this District under 28 U.S.C. § 1391. Plaintiff alleges that venue is proper because Defendant resides here, but sets out an address for Defendant that is in the Southern District of New York. See Complaint 13. The parties are each directed to show cause by Wednesday, September 14, in a letter of three pages or less, why this case should not be transferred to the Southern District of New York. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 9/6/2022. (Guy, Alicia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
4 4 Summons Issued as to Sensio, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Sensio, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15874661, filed by Justin Robert Douglas. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/13/2022.]
Related: [-]