Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Robert D Mariani
Case #: 3:22-cv-01588
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2022
Terminated:May 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2023 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Christine Craig
Represented By
Ryann D. Loftus
Wright, Reihner & Mulcahey
contact info
Danielle M. Mulcahey
Wright & Reihner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Adam Crain
Represented By
Alexis I Roth
Wolf, Baldwin & Associates P.C.
contact info
Defendant
David Piccola
40 Sheridan Street
Plains, PA 18705
Represented By
Alexis I Roth
Wolf, Baldwin & Associates P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mountain Productions, Inc.
Represented By
Jarrett J. Ferentino
Pugliese Finnegan Shaffer & Ferentino LLC
contact info
Mark Frank Pincelli
Phillips Lytle LLP
contact info
Kevin Mulvehill
Phillips Lytle LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 23 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mountain Productions, Inc. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 11/23/22. (jam)
GPO Nov 23 2022
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. See Order for full details. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 11/23/22 (jam)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 30, 2023
79 79 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/30 2:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion78 Surety Bond re TRO is CANCELED, DISCHARGED and RELEASED. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 10/30/2023. (cac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
78 78 1 pgs motion Order Wed 10/25 7:37 PM
MOTION for Order discharging bond by Mountain Productions, Inc..(Pincelli, Mark)
Related: [-]