Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-01321
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2022
Last checked: Friday Oct 14, 2022 12:39 AM MST
Defendant
Alfredo Felix-Vega (1)
Represented By
Carlos Anthony Brown
Carlos A Brown PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lindsay Lee Short
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/14/2022 1:17 AM MST
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
Arrest of Alfredo Felix-Vega on 8/17/2022. (SLQ) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alfredo Felix-Vega. (SLQ) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Initial Appearance as to Alfredo Felix-Vega held on 8/18/2022. FINANCIAL ABILITY STATEMENT REVIEWED AND DEFENDANT SWORN. CJA attorney Carlos Anthony Brown appointed for Defendant. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Spanish Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Brian Kasprzyk on behalf of Lindsay Short for the Government, CJA Attorney Carlos Brown for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Susana Carman assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 3:10 PM to 3:12 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(SLQ)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Alfredo Felix-Vega. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/18/22.(SLQ) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Alfredo Felix-Vega.(Brown, Carlos) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
Thursday, September 01, 2022
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Alfredo Felix-Vega (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 9/1/22. (EC) [2:22-mj-08239-JZB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
8 8 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Alfredo Felix-Vega (1) count(s) 1. Arraignment set for 10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. (WLP)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
9 9 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Alfredo Felix-Vega. (WLP)
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Alfredo Felix-Vega. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary