Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 1:22-mj-04506
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2022
Last checked: Friday Oct 14, 2022 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Brian Andrew Bushell (1)
Represented By
Cara McNamara
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Defendant
Tracey M.A. Stockton (2)
Represented By
Daniel J. Cloherty
Todd & Weld
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David M. Holcomb
United States Attorney'S Office Ma
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/08/2023 7:08 PM EST
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Brian Andrew Bushell (1), Tracey M.A. Stockton (2).(Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 10/13/2022 (King, Dawn).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs JS45 Bushell,
Att: 2 2 pgs JS45 Stockton,
Att: 3 43 pgs Affidavit
2 2 1 pgs MOTION to Seal as to Brian Andrew Bushell, Tracey M.A. Stockton by USA. (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
3 3 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion to Seal as to Brian Andrew Bushell (1), Tracey M.A. Stockton (2) (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]