Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-02468
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2022
Last checked: Friday Oct 14, 2022 2:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Miguel Angel Ocura-Arenas (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 10/14/2022 3:10 AM CDT
Monday, October 10, 2022
Arrest of Miguel Angel Ocura (ccl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 10/12/2022 as to Miguel Angel Ocura. (ccl)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Miguel Angel Ocura. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Miguel Angel Ocura (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. as to Miguel Angel Ocura (1). by Judge Collis White. (mgc)
Related: [-]
True Name of Defendant as to Miguel Angel Ocura. True name of defendant is: Miguel Angel Ocura-Arenas. (mgc)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Collis White as to Miguel Angel Ocura. (ccl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Collis White as to Miguel Angel Ocura. (ccl)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Initial Appearance as to Miguel Angel Ocura held on 10/12/2022 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2022 10:30AM before Judge Collis White, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Miguel Angel Ocura (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - MCIENEGA.) (drda)
Related: [-]