PRESSON v. 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-20627 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS PRESSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 12/21 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of First Amended Short Form Complaint by THOMAS PRESSON re3 Amended Complaint (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |
|
Sunday, December 11, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Sun 12/11 12:32 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, filed by THOMAS PRESSON. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 10/14 11:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/14 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7512524.), filed by THOMAS PRESSON. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |