New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:22-cv-06218
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2022
Terminated:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A
Represented By
Marina Plotkin
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Roy W. Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Echo Drugs, Inc.
Represented By
Marina Plotkin
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Roy W. Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Khalia Hayslett
Represented By
Glen Parker
Parker Hanski LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, August 02, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 08/02 10:47 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re37 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Echo Drugs, Inc., Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/2/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/01 11:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (VOLUNTARY) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc. (Batres, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 06/27 2:46 PM
ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this matter on June 27, 2024. Attorney Glen Parker appeared on behalf of plaintiff and attorney Andrea E. Batres appeared on behalf of defendants. The parties reported reaching a settlement in principle. The Court commends the parties for their efforts to resolve this matter. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this case by July 31, 2024. (FTR Log #9:38-9:41.) (NL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 06/13 5:42 PM
ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this matter on June 13, 2024. Attorney Glen Parker appeared on behalf of plaintiff and attorney Andrea E. Batres appeared on behalf of defendants. The parties represent that they are discussing settlement and making progress towards resolution. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on June 27, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (571) 353-2301 and use the Meeting ID 487699719 promptly at 9:30 a.m. on June 27, 2024. If the parties notify the Court that they have reached a settlement by June 25, 2024, I will cancel the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/13/2024. (Cisco Log #11:05-11:10.) (NL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 05/29 2:41 PM
ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this matter on May 29, 2024. Attorney Glen Parker appeared on behalf of plaintiff and attorney Andrea E. Batres appeared on behalf of defendants. The parties represent that they are still discussing settlement. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on June 13, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (571) 353-2301 and use the Meeting ID 487699719 promptly at 11:00 a.m. on June 13, 2024. If the parties notify the Court of a settlement by June 11, 2024, I will cancel the conference. (Cisco Log #9:32-9:47.) (NL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
order Scheduling Order Tue 05/07 4:04 PM
ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this matter on May 7, 2024. Attorney Glen Parker appeared on behalf of plaintiff; attorney Andrea E. Batres appeared on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff and representatives for defendants were also present. The parties stated that they wanted more time to attempt to reach a settlement. As new counsel has been retained by defendants, the Court will give the parties more time. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on May 29, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (571) 353-2301 and use the Meeting ID 487699719 promptly at 9:30 a.m. on May 29, 2024. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. The Court urges the parties to resolve this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/7/2024. (NL)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 05/07 4:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Status Conference held on 5/7/2024 (FTR Log #11:18-11:59.) (NL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Scheduling Order Mon 05/06 1:11 PM
ORDER: Defendants request clarification as to whether representatives of Echo Drugs and Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A are required to appear at the May 7, 2024 conference. ECF No.36 . The answer is yes. The conference to be held on Tuesday was initially scheduled for March 12. I issued orders changing the date of the conference, but not my directive that "[c]ounsel, plaintiff, a representative with full settlement authority for defendant Echo Drugs and a separate representative with full settlement authority for defendant Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation shall appear in person." And even if my orders were unclear, defendants should not have waited until the Friday afternoon before the conference to ask for clarification. The Court's order has been on the docket for weeks (and incoming counsel filed a notice of appearance in March). Defendants' motions to substitute attorneys, ECF No. 34 , 35 , are granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Edward Miller from the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/6/2024. (NL)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 05/06 4:14 PM
ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the status conference scheduled for tomorrow, May 7, 2024, is rescheduled from 10:30 a.m. to 11:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/6/2024. (NL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
36 36 misc Letter Fri 05/03 4:44 PM
Letter requesting clarification by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc. (Batres, Andrea)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 05/03 11:19 AM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Proposed Order) by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A. (Batres, Andrea)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 05/03 11:16 AM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Proposed Order) by Echo Drugs, Inc.. (Batres, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
utility Email Test Thu 05/02 11:50 AM
Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Phone/Email Tue 04/23 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Change of Name, Address, Telephone, and Email Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Tue 04/23 4:14 PM
REPORT of Mediation Unsettled. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
32 32 misc Transcript Thu 04/18 1:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 19, 2023, before Judge Bloom. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC. Email address: aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/9/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2024. (LH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 04/03 3:18 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff requests, with defendants' consent, an adjournment of the April 11, 2024 status conference. ECF No.31 . The request is granted. The Court shall hold the conference on May 7, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/3/2024. (VP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
31 31 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 04/02 6:11 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference of April 11, 2024 by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 03/08 12:22 PM
ORDER: Defendants' current counsel reports that his clients are in the process of changing attorneys and requests to stay the case for 30 days to allow incoming counsel to familiarize themselves with this matter. ECF No.29 . The request is granted. The March 12, 2024 conference is adjourned to April 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/8/2024. (IK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea E. Batres on behalf of Echo Drugs, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Batres, Andrea)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Stay Thu 03/07 1:35 PM
First MOTION to Stay by Echo Drugs, Inc.. (Miller, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
28 28 misc Status Report Tue 02/20 6:36 PM
STATUS REPORT by Khalia Hayslett (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 01, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 02/01 4:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2024 (FTR Log #: 10:13 - 10:33). (IK)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Thu 02/01 4:37 PM
ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference in this matter on February 1, 2024. The parties shall file a joint status letter by February 20, 2024. The Court shall hold a status conference on March 12, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel, plaintiff, a representative with full settlement authority for defendant Echo Drugs and a separate representative with full settlement authority for defendant Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation shall appear in person and participate at the conference. If counsel, a party, or its representative fails to appear, the Court shall impose an appropriate sanction. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/1/2024. (IK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 01/31 3:32 PM
ORDER: The parties request that the Court adjourn the February 1 conference. ECF No.27 . The request is denied, among other reasons, because it was filed less than seventy-two (72) hours before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/31/2024. (IK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
27 27 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 01/30 1:07 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference of February 1, 2024 to a date in March 2024 by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 12/19 6:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2023 (AT&T Log #: 3:12 - 3:30.) (IK)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 12/19 6:08 PM
ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference in this matter on December 19, 2023. Plaintiff's motion to compel, ECF No.26 , is denied for the reasons stated on the record. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on February 1, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:00 a.m. on February 1, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/19/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
order Scheduling Order Tue 12/05 3:38 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff moves for an Order "compelling the attendance of defendant Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A and the insurance adjuster at a mediation." ECF No.26 . Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's motion by December 11, 2023. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on December 19, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 3:00 p.m. on December 19, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/5/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
26 26 motion Compel Mon 12/04 9:39 AM
MOTION to Compel the attendance of defendant Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A and the insurance adjuster at a mediation by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Wed 09/27 7:52 AM
STATUS REPORT and request to extend time for mediation and status report by Khalia Hayslett (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Wed 09/27 3:04 PM
ORDER: The parties request an extension of the deadline to complete mediation because they have scheduled a second mediation session. ECF No.25 . The request is granted. The parties shall complete mediation by December 4, 2023 and file a status letter by December 15, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/27/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion to Compel Mon 07/31 10:18 AM
ORDER: The parties report resolving their mediation dispute and request that the Court extend the deadline to complete mediation and cancel tomorrow's conference. ECF No.24 . The request is granted. The parties shall complete mediation by September 29, 2023 and file a status letter by October 13, 2023. The conference scheduled for August 1, 2023 is hereby canceled. At plaintiffs request, her motion to compel, ECF No.22 , is marked withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/31/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
24 24 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 07/28 2:26 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference Cancel Conference and extend mediation deadline by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 07/27 1:57 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff requests, with defendants' consent, that the Court hold the August 1, 2023 conference by telephone. ECF No.23 . The request is granted, however the conference is rescheduled from 11:30 a.m. to 10:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:00 a.m. on August 1, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/27/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
23 23 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 07/26 5:40 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference convert to a Telephone Conference the August 1, 2023 conference by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
order Scheduling Order Tue 07/18 7:17 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff moves to compel defendants to "go forward with the scheduled September 13, 2023 mediation" or "have discovery resume" because defendants are refusing "in bad faith" to mediate with the selected mediator. ECF No.22 . Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's letter by July 25, 2023. The Court shall hold a conference in this matter on August 1, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/18/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
22 22 motion Compel Mon 07/17 12:30 PM
MOTION to Compel defendants to go forward with the scheduled September 13, 2023 mediation; or terminate the mediation referral and have discovery resume by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/07 12:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 6/7/2023 (AT&T Log #: 10:31 - 10:45). (IK)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Request Mediation Wed 06/07 12:40 PM
ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference in plaintiff's ADA action on June 7, 2023. Defendants shall produce the lease agreement between the defendants to plaintiff by June 9, 2023. For the reasons discussed on the record, plaintiff's motion to compel, ECF No.20 , is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Marina Plotkin and Roy W. Breitenbach from the docket. See ECF No.19 . The parties' motion for a referral to Court-annexed mediation, ECF No.21 , is granted. The parties shall contact the Court's ADR department to select a mediator and schedule the mediation. The parties shall complete the mediation by August 15, 2023 and file a status letter by August 22, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/7/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Wed 06/07 2:07 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place (in-person or remote) of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (TP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
21 21 motion Request Mediation Fri 06/02 4:56 PM
Consent Motion to Request Mediation and stay litigation pending completion by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
order Scheduling Order Tue 05/30 11:37 AM
ORDER: Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's motion to compel, ECF No.20 , by June 2, 2023. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference in this matter on June 7, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:30 a.m. on June 7, 2023. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/30/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 28, 2023
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Sun 05/28 1:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Letter and to direct defendants to provide supplemental responses by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Fri 05/26 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Roy W. Breitenbach (Breitenbach, Roy)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Fri 05/26 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Roy W. Breitenbach (Breitenbach, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/24 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Miller on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Miller, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/28 2:47 PM
ORDER: Defendants' outgoing counsel requests, with plaintiff's consent, a 30-day stay of this matter to allow defendants' newly retained counsel to "to get up to speed on this case." ECF No.16 . The request is granted and this matter is stayed through May 28, 2023. The parties shall file a status letter by June 1, 2023 and state whether expert discovery will be required in this matter and, if so, proposing a deadline for its completion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/28/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
16 16 motion Stay Thu 04/27 3:29 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc.. (Plotkin, Marina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/14 5:22 PM
ORDER: Defendants request, with plaintiff's consent, an extension of the deadline to complete discovery. ECF No.15 . The request is granted. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by June 14, 2023 and file a status letter by April 28, 2023 stating whether expert discovery will be required in this matter and, if so, proposing a deadline for its completion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/14/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/13 12:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Letter , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc.. (Plotkin, Marina)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
14 14 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 04/03 5:01 PM
ORDER regarding motion for protective order, endorsed on doc. #13 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/3/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 02, 2023
13 13 motion Protective Order Sun 04/02 11:13 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 03/09 3:04 PM
ORDER: The motion for a protective order is denied without prejudice. ECF No.12 . First, plaintiff has not signed the stipulation. Second, paragraph seven is unacceptable. The parties must request and be granted permission to file discovery material under seal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/9/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
12 12 motion Protective Order Wed 03/08 9:54 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 01/31 3:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/31/2023 (FTR Log #: 11:33-11:59). (IK)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 01/31 3:20 PM
ORDER: The Court held the initial conference in plaintiff's disability discrimination case on January 31, 2023. Plaintiff withdrew the sixth cause of action in her complaint for common law negligence. The Court set the following discovery schedule: the parties shall amend the pleadings or join new parties by February 28, 2023. Fed R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3)(A). The parties shall complete all fact discovery by May 31, 2023 and file a status letter by April 14, 2023 stating whether expert discovery will be required in this matter and, if so, proposing a deadline for its completion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/31/2023. (IK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 01/23 11:49 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
order Scheduling Order Tue 12/27 8:11 PM
ORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference in plaintiff's ADA case on January 31, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by January 24, 2023. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/27/2022. (VP)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/23 1:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc. (Plotkin, Marina)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/23 1:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc. (Plotkin, Marina)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/23 1:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc.. (Plotkin, Marina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/13 7:06 PM
ORDER: The Court So Orders the parties' stipulation extending the time for defendant Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A to respond to plaintiff's complaint through December 23, 2022. ECF No. 7. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/13/2022. (HY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/12 1:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A. (Breitenbach, Roy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/22 10:39 AM
ORDER: The Court So Orders the parties' stipulation extending the time for defendant Echo Drugs, Inc., to respond to the complaint. ECF No. 5. Echo Drugs, Inc. shall respond to the complaint by December 23, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/22/2022. (HY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/21 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Plotkin on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Plotkin, Marina)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/21 1:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Stipulation enlarging time to answer, move against or respond to Complaint by Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc.. (Breitenbach, Roy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 10/17 12:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc.. (KD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/17 12:25 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 10/17 12:25 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/17 12:24 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/14 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Brooklyn Legal Services Corporation A, Echo Drugs, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16039778 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Khalia Hayslett. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons