Helt v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03564 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Helt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Zgoda, Richard) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Helt v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3564-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Illinois (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10749492.), filed by Edwin Helt. Service due by 1/12/2023(sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/14 5:15 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Helt v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3564-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Illinois (sshe, ) |