Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03043

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:22-cv-08814
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2022
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By
Sarah Johnston
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
WALMART INC.
Represented By
Jennifer Taylor Stewart
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Amy M Gernon
220 Division Street
Northfield, MN 55057
Plaintiff
Michelle Maguire
Represented By
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Ashley C. Keller
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Allen R. Ball
Law Office Of Ball & Yorke
contact info
Plaintiff
D. M.
Represented By
Ashley C. Keller
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Terminated: 01/20/2023
Represented By
Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
King & Spalding
contact info
Ethan Price Davis
King & Spalding
contact info
Austin Evans
King & Spalding
contact info
Jennifer Taylor Stewart
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Livia M. Kiser
King & Spalding
contact info
Kristen Renee Fournier
King & Spalding
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Maguire
Terminated: 01/20/2023
Represented By
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Allen R. Ball
Law Office Of Ball & Yorke
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
102 102 18 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 08/20 12:27 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: Final judgment is entered for defendants in all pending member cases. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment for defendants and to close all pending member cases. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/20/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03043-DLC et al. (vfr)
Related: [-]