Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-20785
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2022
Last checked: Friday Apr 14, 2023 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
BOBBY M GINN, JR
Represented By
JASON LEE NABORS
Nabors Law Firm - Ridgeland Ms
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 11/02 9:23 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel, See Local Rule 15.1(B) Separately Docketing a Motion for Leave and the Amended Pleading. Re4 Amended Complaint filed by BOBBY M GINN, JR (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/27 9:57 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by BOBBY M GINN, JR. (NABORS, JASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/17 11:23 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Note to Filer - re: Case opening procedures. When entering party names please add the full name of the plaintiff as it is listed on the Complaint, (middle name, middle initials, and generation (JR, SR, II, III, etc if needed)) there is a field for each. Clerk will correct party name. (djb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 16, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sun 10/16 9:07 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (NABORS, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 10/16 9:06 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7514598.), filed by BOBBY M GINN. (NABORS, JASON)
Related: [-]