Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Sheri Polster Chappell
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:22-cv-00666
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2022
Terminated:Feb 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 6:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Linda Green
an individual 6891 Estero Blvd.
Fort Myers Beach, FL 33913
Plaintiff
Karley Stokes
an individual 18220 Wildblue Blvd.
Fort Myers, FL 33913
Represented By
Barry Oliver Chase
Law Office Of Barry Oliver Chase, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
order Order Wed 02/08 1:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. No party has filed a proof of service of the summons and complaint per Local Rule 1.10(a). Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice. See M.D. Fla. L. R. 1.10(d). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/8/2023. (CMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/24 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Karley Stokes. (Chase, Barry)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
6 6 order Civil Action Order Fri 10/21 2:27 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/21/2022. (SEH)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons issued Fri 10/21 1:52 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Karley Stokes. (SEH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
misc Disbursement Voucher / Refund Tue 10/18 2:59 PM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-20095161 refunded in the amount of $ $402.00 paid to Barry Chase.. (NLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
4 4 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/17 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs.(Chase, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Terms of Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons
3 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0666-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 10/17 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20095931) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Chase, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
1 1 1 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/17 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20095161) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Chase, Barry)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/17 12:36 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0666-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
Related: [-]