Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-20796
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 7:15 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
JON TINGSTROM
Represented By
KATHARINE GALE KROTTINGER
Monsour Law Firm - Longview Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 12/21 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of First Amended Short Form Complaint by JON TINGSTROM re3 Amended Complaint (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 11, 2022
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 12/11 12:48 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, filed by JON TINGSTROM. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/17 10:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/17 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7515184.), filed by JON TINGSTROM. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]