Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: Katherine P Nelson
Case #: 1:22-cv-00406
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
CauseJob Discrimination (Pregancy)
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 4:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.
Represented By
Arnold W. Umbach, III
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
Scott D. Stevens
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
Averie Louise Armstead
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Rix
Represented By
Ronnie L. Williams
contact info
Reginald Williams
Williams & Associates, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 09 2023
ORDER denying 26 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/9/2023. (meh)
GPO Aug 07 2023
Order GRANTING 19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc, as set out. Accordingly, this action is STAYED. The parties shall, on or before November 7, 2023, to file a joint report to advise the Court as to the status of the arbitration. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/07/2023. (jmr)

Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
47 47 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 04/30 12:30 PM
ORDER denying43 Motion to Vacate43 MOTION to Vacate38 Order, as set out. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/30/2025. (meh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
utility Document Referred Fri 10/18 12:59 PM
REFERRAL OF46 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
46 46 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/17 8:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion43 filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit AAA Confirmation of Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Actual Motion to Reset Hearing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendant's Objection to Motion,
Att: 4 Exhibit Arbitrator's Internet Link,
Att: 5 Exhibit Denial of Continuance
Thursday, October 03, 2024
45 45 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/03 9:37 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re43 MOTION to Vacate38 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines, filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Jones, Averie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E
utility Document Referred Thu 10/03 10:30 AM
REFERRAL OF45 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
44 44 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/19 3:59 PM
Order re:43 MOTION to Vacate38 Order filed by Alexis Rix. Defendant shall file any Response on or before 10/3/2024. Plaintiff shall file any Reply on or before 10/17/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/19/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 09/19 9:00 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:43 MOTION to Vacate38 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
43 43 motion Vacate Wed 09/18 5:51 PM
MOTION to Vacate38 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines, filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to Reset Hearing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Goggle Link,
Att: 3 Exhibit Doctor's Note,
Att: 4 Exhibit Order Denying Reset,
Att: 5 Exhibit Invitation for 14 Day Continuance,
Att: 6 Exhibit Order Denying 14 Day Continuance,
Att: 7 Exhibit Order on Reconsideration,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2nd Motion to Reconsider,
Att: 9 Exhibit Tele Conference Notice,
Att: 10 Exhibit Order Dismissing Case
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
42 42 order Order - Document NOTED Wed 03/06 12:04 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Status Report41 . The parties shall file, on or before 10/30/2024, a Joint Status Report advising the Court as to the status of the arbitration. (gcp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
41 41 misc Status Report Wed 02/28 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Jones, Averie)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 02/28 3:51 PM
REFERRAL OF41 Status Report to Judge DuBose. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/27 12:14 PM
Order re:39 Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. Joint Report advising the Court as to the status of the arbitration due on or before 2/29/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/27/2023. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
39 39 motion Status Tue 11/07 9:16 AM
Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Jones, Averie)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Tue 11/07 9:20 AM
REFERRAL OF39 Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
38 38 22 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 08/07 10:55 AM
Order GRANTING19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc, as set out. Accordingly, this action is STAYED. The parties shall, on or before November 7, 2023, to file a joint report to advise the Court as to the status of the arbitration. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/07/2023. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
37 37 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Wed 07/26 5:40 PM
Notice of Filing Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
36 36 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Wed 07/05 7:35 PM
Notice of Filing Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
35 35 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Fri 06/30 6:25 PM
Notice of Filing Deposition Notices - Hornung & Boykin filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
34 34 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Fri 06/30 5:11 PM
Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
33 33 order Protective Order Thu 06/29 3:15 PM
QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER entered.Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/29/2023. (jmr)
Related: [-]
32 32 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 06/29 3:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Motion for Protective Order. Confidentiality and Protective Order entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/29/2023. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
31 31 motion Protective Order Tue 06/27 11:10 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Protective Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order HIPAA Protective Order
utility Motions Referred Tue 06/27 12:51 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:31 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Discovery Fri 06/09 1:52 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/9/2023. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/30 11:49 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion26 filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Tue 05/30 4:33 PM
REFERRAL OF29 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Nelson. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
utility Document Referred Tue 05/23 12:36 PM
REFERRAL OF28 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Nelson. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/22 6:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Purposted Arbitration Agreement
Friday, May 12, 2023
27 27 order Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing Fri 05/12 3:40 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re:26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. District Judge referred said motion to Mag. Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (5/9/2023 elec. ref.). Plaintiff's brief in response to said motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than 5/23/2023. Defendant's brief in reply to the response, if any, must be filed and served no later than 5/30/2023. Motion to be taken under submission on 5/31/2023. Except as permitted by the Court's Local Rules, e.g. , S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), no other briefing or submissions addressing the subject motion may be filed without leave of the Court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/12/2023. (ctn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
26 26 motion Stay Discovery Tue 05/09 3:44 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Umbach, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
utility Motions Referred Tue 05/09 4:25 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:26 MOTION to Stay Discovery Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (meh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
utility Document Referred Fri 04/14 8:40 AM
REFERRAL OF25 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge DuBose. (fz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/13 5:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion19 Def. Reply to Plaintiff's Response Opposing Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Friday, April 07, 2023
utility Document Referred Fri 04/07 3:05 PM
REFERRAL OF24 Evidentiary Material,23 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
24 24 misc Evidentiary Material Thu 04/06 11:47 PM
Evidentiary Material filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Reginald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Text Messages,
Att: 2 Exhibit Hornung Email to Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit Def Counsel Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit Unsigned ADRP,
Att: 5 Exhibit Signature Receipt,
Att: 6 Affidavit Declaration of Alexis Rix
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/06 11:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing Fri 03/24 11:42 AM
Order Setting Motion Deadline re:19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.,20 Brief filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. Responses due by 4/6/2023. Replies due by 4/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/24/2023. (fz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
utility Motions No Longer Referred Thu 03/23 1:39 PM
Motions No Longer Referred to MJ:19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration is now referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Thu 03/23 1:40 PM
REFERRAL OF20 Brief to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/22 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald Williams on behalf of Alexis Rix (Williams, Reginald)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Brief Wed 03/22 10:33 AM
Brief filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. re19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
19 19 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 03/22 10:29 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 03/22 11:09 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (fz)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 03/22 11:09 AM
REFERRAL OF20 Brief to Judge Nelson. (fz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
18 18 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Mon 03/20 10:43 PM
Notice of Filing Interrogatory, Request for Production, Request for Admissions & Request for Deposition Dates filed by Alexis Rix. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/15 4:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Jury Selection set for 7/2/2024 at 08:45AM. Trial to take place in the month of July 2024, dates to be specified at the final pretrial conference. ETT 3 days. Discovery cutoff 12/31/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2023. Motions due by 1/26/2024. Position Regarding Settlement due by 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/15/2023. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Pretrial Order
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 02/16 8:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Scheduling Conference held on 2/15/2023. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/03 12:28 PM
Order re:14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson BY TELEPHONE. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/3/2023. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 02/02 9:11 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Umbach, Arnold)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Thu 02/02 12:21 PM
REFERRAL OF14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
13 13 order Order - Document NOTED Thu 01/05 10:04 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement11 filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. Review of the Statement does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (khc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
12 12 order Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/03 2:22 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER on11 ,9 Disclosure Statements filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/3/2023. (ctn)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/03 11:37 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Umbach, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/28 10:22 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER re:9 Disclosure Statement filed by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.: The disclosure statement cites, and tracks the language of, only Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. This is insufficient because the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."); (Doc. 3 (ordering the Defendant to "file a disclosure statement certifying disclosures required by both S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1... and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1...")). Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. is ORDERED to file an amended/supplemental disclosure statement that certifies disclosure required by S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than 1/3/2023, and is encouraged (though not required) to do so using the Court's form (available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). See S.D. Ala. GenLR 84 ("The forms in the Appendix suffice under these Local Rules and illustrate the information that the Court deems necessary in those situations applicable to each form."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/28/2022. (ctn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/27 2:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Umbach, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/21 11:21 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement certifying disclosures required by both S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 Related [+] and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 no later than 12/27/2022 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/21/2022. (ctn)
Related: [-] quired of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties"quired of "nongovernmental corporate" parties
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/21 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Stevens on behalf of Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Preliminary Scheduling Order Wed 12/21 8:35 AM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/21/2022. (meh) (#1 Consent Form)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/20 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Averie Louise Armstead on behalf of Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. (Armstead, Averie)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/20 3:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc.. (Umbach, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/13 11:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Rix. Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. served on 12/3/2022, answer due 12/27/2022 (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/18 1:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Northcutt Dental Management Services, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/17 7:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Northcutt Dental Management Services, INC. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3087319, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Alexis Rix. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/15/2023. (Williams, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons