California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:René Lastreto II
Case #: 1:22-bk-11769
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Nov 18, 2022

Debtor
Premier Rail Services, Inc.
PO Box 2586
Tehachapi, CA 93581-2586
Represented By
D. Max Gardner
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeffrey M. Vetter
PO Box 2424
Bakersfield, CA 93303
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721


Docket last updated: 10/18/2022 12:01 AM PDT
Monday, October 17, 2022
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI] Mon 10/17 9:25 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $338.00, Receipt Number: 378769, eFilingID: 7142752) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Mon 10/17 9:16 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $338.00) (D Max Gardner) (eFilingID: 7142752)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Mon 10/17 9:17 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 11/18/2022 at 11:00 AM. See our website for location. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Master Address List Mon 10/17 9:20 AM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Mon 10/17 9:22 AM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Jeffrey M. Vetter (auto)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Incomplete Filing and NOI to Dismiss Case - Chapter 7 Mon 10/17 9:59 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Statement of Financial Affairs; Attorney Disclosure Statement; Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors;Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; Document(s) due by 10/31/2022. (mgrs)
Related: [-]