Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Greg N Stivers
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:22-cv-00554
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1446nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2022
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 22-CI-004743
Last checked: Saturday Apr 15, 2023 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
BIGO Technology PTE. LTD.
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By
Grace E.L. Greenwell
Tachau Meek PLC
contact info
Dustin E. Meek
Tachau Meek PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BVN Beauty Supplies, LLC
Represented By
Zachary L. Taylor
Winton & Hiestand Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Tran
Represented By
Zachary L. Taylor
Winton & Hiestand Law Group PLLC
contact info

GPO Jan 31 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/30/2024 granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. cc: Counsel (KDY)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/28 3:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Meek, Dustin)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 05/28 3:12 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/28/2024. Immediately prior to the May 28, 2024 settlement conference, counsel for the Parties informed the undersigned that the Parties anticipated reaching a resolution for all claims on that same day and did not require a settlement conference. Therefore, the settlement conference on May 28, 2024 is REMANDED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (TLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
28 28 order Order - TEXT ONLY Fri 05/24 2:59 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/24/2024. Counsel for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Chase) contacted the undersigned's Chambers to request an ex parte call regarding settlement. On May 24, 2024, the undersigned conducted the ex parte call to discuss Defendant's position on settlement. Based on the discussion, the Parties are directed to continue settlement discussions over the weekend regarding an audio recording that may impact the Parties' positions on settlement prior to the May 28, 2024, settlement conference. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (TLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
27 27 5 pgs order Order Wed 05/08 2:35 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 05/08/2024. A settlement conference in this action is set for Tuesday, May 28, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. Eastern Time to be conducted via Zoom video conference. Any party who wishes to request that the conference be held in person on the scheduled date at the Gene Snyder Courthouse, 601 W. Broadway, Louisville, Kentucky 40202, shall request the same via e-mail to theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov and copy opposing counsel no later than fourteen days after entry of this order. Counsel shall review the entirety of this order. Anyone who fails to comply with any provision of this order may be subject to the full range of sanctions authorized by law. cc: Counsel (HMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/01 2:41 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 4/30/2024. On or before 5/6/2024 the Parties shall contact the Court to schedule a settlement conference. The deadlines for discovery and the filing of Daubert/dispositive motions shall be HELD IN ABEYANCE until further order by the Court. cc: counsel (KDY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 04/09 4:39 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Meek, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
24 24 minutes Status Conference Thu 03/14 11:21 AM
ORDER for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/12/2024. On or before 4/9/2024, the Parties shall confer and jointly report on the topics discussed during the conference, including the question of jurisdiction, the status of discovery, and whether the Parties have reached a confidentiality agreement. cc: counsel (KDY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/14 5:15 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Meek, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/01 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Substitution by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Greenwell, Grace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/31 1:30 PM
PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by BVN Beauty Supplies, LLC against JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association re DN1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (KDY)
Related: [-]
20 20 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 01/31 1:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/30/2024 granting17 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. cc: Counsel (KDY)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
19 19 respm Reply Fri 10/06 1:13 PM
REPLY re18 Response to Motion, & Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Greenwell, Grace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
18 18 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/05 5:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Notice of Removal, Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Greenwell, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unreported & Unpublished Cited Cases,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/15 5:40 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Plaintiffs BVN Beauty Supplies, LLC, Peter Tran (Taylor, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
16 16 4 pgs order Order Wed 03/08 2:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/7/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2023. Daubert Motion due by 6/28/2024. Discovery due by 4/15/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2024. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 2/15/2024. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 1/4/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2023. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 3/13/2023. Status Conference set for 3/12/2024 09:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay.cc:counsel (JWM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
15 15 order Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 03/07 2:12 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/7/2023. The 3/8/2023 telephonic scheduling conference is REMANDED from the docket. The Court will issue a scheduling plan by separate order. Any party that would like to discuss the scheduling plan may contact case manager Theresa Burch at theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov to schedule a telephonic conference. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (TLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan) Wed 03/01 4:42 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Greenwell, Grace)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 02/17 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Zachary L. Taylor (Taylor, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 2:45 PM
ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 1/20/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2023 9:45 AM EST in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Meeting of the parties due by 2/15/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2023. See Order for details.cc:counsel; TB-Case Manager (JWM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
11 11 notice Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent Thu 01/19 1:39 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the[LINK:Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge] and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at[LINK:intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov] . (TJD)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order - TEXT ONLY Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/19 1:37 PM
TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 1/19/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record; TLB (TJD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/17 5:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Greenwell, Grace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Thu 12/15 8:39 AM
AGREED ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/14/2022 granting6 Proposed Agreed Order. Chase's deadline to respond to the Plaintiff's complaint is enlarged to January 16, 2023. cc: Counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Tue 12/13 7:59 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BVN Beauty Supplies, LLC. (Taylor, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 motion Proposed Agreed Order Mon 12/12 6:49 PM
Proposed Agreed Order Enlarging Response Deadline by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Greenwell, Grace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 notice Deficiency Wed 10/19 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Corporate Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/26/2022. (CDL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/18 9:53 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re: DN1 Notice of Removal. (CDL)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assignment Tue 10/18 9:49 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/18 9:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. and Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (CDL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 10/18 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Answer Filed) by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-004743, (Filing fee $402; Receipt No. AKYWDC-3679639), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (CDL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - KY SOS Filings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet