Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mia Roberts Perez
Case #: 2:22-cv-04164
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2022
Terminated:May 10, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-20
Defendant
THE ANGES IRWIN SCHOOL
Plaintiff
NATALIE ABULHAWA
Represented By
TIMOTHY N. WELBECK
Council On American-Islamic Relations
contact info
TIMOTHY WELBECK
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/10 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (WELBECK, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/10 7:29 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by THE ANGES IRWIN SCHOOL. (DIAZ, JOANN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/03 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOANN VELTRUP DIAZ on behalf of THE ANGES IRWIN SCHOOL (DIAZ, JOANN)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/03 1:36 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, JOANN DIAZ (ATTORNEY ID#79741), FILE AN ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT BY THE END OF BUSINESS TODAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 5/3/23. 5/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/03 1:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by THE ANGES IRWIN SCHOOL.(DIAZ, JOANN)
Related: [-]
6 6 minutes Status Conference Wed 05/03 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ Status Conference held on 5/3/23. (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/27 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR WEDNESDAY, MAY 3, 2023, AT 10:30 A.M. VIA VIDEO BEFORE THE HONORABLE MIA R. PEREZ. 4/27/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (miah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
4 4 minutes Status Conference Thu 02/23 6:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ Status Conference held on 2/22/23. (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/15 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Status Conference: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 22, 2023, AT 2:45 P.M. VIA VIDEO BEFORE THE HONORABLE MIA R. PEREZ. 2/15/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (miah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/30 10:07 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON TO THE HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/27/23. 1/30/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/18 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-20, THE ANGES IRWIN SCHOOL, filed by NATALIE ABULHAWA. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 10/18 8:37 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NATALIE ABULHAWA. (bw)
Related: [-]