Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Referred: Carol Sandra Moore Wells
Case #: 2:14-cv-05434
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2014
Terminated:Jun 03, 2015
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 1:42 AM EDT
Defendant
MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
HEMA PATEL MEHTA
Fineman Krekstein & Harris
contact info
EDWARD J. TUITE
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS BASCIANO
Represented By
JOSEPH B. MAYERS
Mayers Mennies & Sherr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON BASCIANO
Represented By
JOSEPH B. MAYERS
Mayers Mennies & Sherr LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP
Terminated: 10/17/2014
Represented By
NICHOLAS D. BOWERS
Marshall Dennehey Warner
contact info
HEMA PATEL MEHTA
Fineman Krekstein & Harris
contact info
EDWARD J. TUITE
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
20 20 order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 06/03 11:00 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). ANY OUTSTANDING MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 6/2/15. 6/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 16, 2015
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 04/16 11:37 AM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS' NOTICES OF DEPOSITION DIRECTED TO MID-CENTURY EMPLOYEES TIMOTHY MCQUILLAN AND PAUL KETELOOT13 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/15/15.4/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/15 11:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY Recorded Telephone Conference held on 4/14/15 (ti, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/10 11:15 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS' NOTICES OF DEPOSITION13 , ON 4/14/2015 AT 5:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/9/15. 4/10/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
16 16 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 04/09 2:49 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Farmers Insurance Group by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY.(TUITE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2015
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/03 10:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER DATED 11/19/201411 IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR MEDIATION BEFORE CHIEF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL WELLS ON 6/5/2015 AT 10:30 AM IN ROOM 3016, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/1/2015. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 8/24/2015. NO LATER THAN 9/21/2015, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND ANY OTHER PRETRIAL MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 10/5/2015. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/19/2015 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5614). THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 10/27/2015 AT 9:30 AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/2/15. 4/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2015
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/26 10:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION for Protective Order to Quash Plaintiffs Notices of Depositions Directed to Mid-Century Employees Timothy McQuillan and Paul Kesteloot and Memorandum of Law filed by NICHOLAS BASCIANO, SHARON BASCIANO. (MAYERS, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
13 13 motion Protective Order Wed 03/25 11:49 AM
MOTION for Protective Order to Quash Plaintiffs Notices of Depositions Directed to Mid-Century Employees Timothy McQuillan and Paul Kesteloot filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(TUITE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY: Pretrial Conference held on 11/18/14 (ti, )
Related: [-]
11 11 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR MEDIATION BEFORE CHIEF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL WELLS ON 4/23/2015 AT 10:30 AM IN ROOM 3016, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/17/2015. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 7/10/2015. NO LATER THAN 8/7/2015, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND ANY OTHER PRETRIAL MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 8/21/2015. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/3/2015 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5614). THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 9/10/2015 AT 9:30 AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/19/14. 11/19/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 17, 2014
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS D. BOWERS on behalf of FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP (BOWERS, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 13, 2014
9 9 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP, MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY. (TUITE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 23, 2014
8 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ti, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 17, 2014
7 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY BE CHANGED TO MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/17/14. 10/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 16, 2014
6 6 STIPULATION To Correct Defendant by FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP. (PATEL MEHTA, HEMA) Modified on 10/17/2014 (afm, ). (FOWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 09, 2014
5 5 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 11/18/2014, AT 4:00 PM IN ROOM 5614, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/9/14. 10/9/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
4 4 ANSWER to Complaint by FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP.(PATEL MEHTA, HEMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 03, 2014
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. TUITE on behalf of FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP (TUITE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 19, 2014
2 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP.(tj, )
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP from Philadelphia CCP, case number 140801874. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 108256), Certificate of Service.(tj, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form,
Att: 4 Case Management Track Form